Arelis Araujo, et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Plaintiff: arelis araujo, Michael Erde, Fatima Mahrukh, Donna Cornett, Yarely Mora, Rolando Cohen, Janice Torres, Ceferino Paulino, Christopher Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Akram Kaiser, Noreen Boffa, Abdon Lopez, Margarita Maria Rosas, Kentaro Mizuta, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Luis Araujo, Carolyn Mason, Marilyn Beckford, Paul Hinton, Rosa Zayas, Patrick Donohue, Jhoana Juca, Rhonda Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Shannon Thomason, Victor Arteaga, Marina Perez, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Claudia Rivas, Edwin Zayas, Justine Ferreira, Jose Garzon, Vinnie Penna, Yvonne Davis, Nahoko Mizuta, Eileen Mendez, Andrea Phillips, Brenda Melendez, Lynn Chaperon, Maria Hidalgo, Linda Larach-Cohen, John Burgess, Dorothy Neske, Ms Linda Larach-Cohen, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Abundio Sanchez, Alexandra Fiallos and Susanne Erde
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE") and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv07032
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Recent Legal Authority re: #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, .. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Ashanti, Karl)
October 22, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . . Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 22, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ashanti, Karl)
October 16, 2020 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT. re: outstanding documents for W.R. and L.N. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 13, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karl J. Ashanti, Esq. dated October 13, 2020 re: #29 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, pending resolution of defendant's motion for reconsideration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen Kitzinger dated October 9, 2020. . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Ashanti, Karl)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by October 19, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for K.A. It is further ORDERED that by October 21, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for A.C. and O.C. It is further ORDERED that by October 22, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for S.C., Y.K.M., A.L., S.J.D. and J.B. It is further ORDERED that by October 23, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for L.V.F. It is further ORDERED that by October 28, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for Z.A. It is further ORDERED that by November 2, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for E.P. It is further ORDERED that by October 16, 2020, Plaintiffs and Defendant shall meet and confer to determine what required documentation for pendency funding for W.R. and L.N. has not been submitted and shall file a joint status letter describing any outstanding documentation and Plaintiffs' plan to submit such documentation. By October 23, 2020, Plaintiffs shall submit such documentation to the relevant agencies and file a letter certifying such submission. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/13/2020) (rro)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Sapna Kapoor in Support re: #29 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, pending resolution of defendant's motion for reconsideration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen Kitzinger dated October 9, 2020.. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, pending resolution of defendant's motion for reconsideration addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Stephen Kitzinger dated October 9, 2020. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that by October 22, 2020, Plaintiffs and Defendant shall file any oppositions to the motions for reconsideration per the Individual Rules. No replies shall be filed. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Responses due by 10/22/2020) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/9/2020) (cf)
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . . Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
October 8, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Ashanti, Karl)
October 8, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,, . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Nahoko Mizuta, Edwin Zayas, Jose Garzon, Ceferino Paulino, Brenda Melendez, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rolando Cohen, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Luis Araujo, Akram Kaiser, Maria Hidalgo, Vinnie Penna, Eileen Mendez, Lynn Chaperon, Andrea Phillips, Noreen Boffa, Claudia Rivas, Rhonda Ambrister, Jhoana Juca, Margarita Maria Rosas, Darren Ambrister, Yarely Mora, Christopher Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Michael Erde, Fatima Mahrukh, Marilyn Beckford, Dorothy Neske, Linda Larach-Cohen, Donna Cornett, John Burgess, Patrick Donohue, Kentaro Mizuta, Victor Arteaga, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Arelis Araujo, Paul Hinton, Alexandra Fiallos, Susanne Erde, Rosa Zayas, Marina Perez, Abdon Lopez, Abundio Sanchez, Cynthia Ramos, Onaney Polanco, Janice Torres, Yvonne Davis, Carolyn Mason, Justine Ferreira, Shannon Thomason. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is GRANTED in part. It is hereby ORDERED that by October 14, 2020, Defendant shall provide pendency funding for those thirteen students who the parties agree have pendency at iBRAIN. Such funding shall be in accordance with the (1) prior pendency orders, (2) federal court orders or (3) findings and decisions following a hearing on a due process complaint from a prior school year creating such pendency. Plaintiffs' motion is DENIED with respect to the remaining twenty students. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the docket entry at # 6. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/24/2020) (ks)
September 18, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Ashanti, Karl)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karl J. Ashanti, Esq. dated September 16, 2020 re: Reply Brief. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Rosa Zayas..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Brian Reimels in Opposition re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by New York City Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Intention to Appeal, #2 Exhibit SRO Decision, #3 Exhibit Pendency Order, #4 Exhibit SRO Decision).(Kitzinger, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sapna Kapoor in Opposition re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
September 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: darren ambrister, Individually;victor arteaga, Individually;michael erde, Individually;claudia rivas, Individually; Justine Ferreira, Individually;rhonda ambrister, Individually;donna cornett, Individually;rolando cohen, Individually;Edwin Zayas, Individually; Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually;lynn chaperon, Individually;luis araujo, Individually;marina perez, Individually;marilyn beckford, Individually;arelis araujo, Individually;susanne erde, Individually;ceferino paulino, Individually;Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually;shannon thomason, Individually;patrick donohue, Individually;carolyn mason, Individually;fatima mahrukh, Individually;brenda melendez, Individually;janice torres, Individually;alexandra fiallos, Individually;Maria Hidalgo, Individually;eileen mendez, Individually;yarely mora, Individually;Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually;abdon lopez, Individually;jose garzon, Individually;Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually;dorothy neske, Individually;Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually;Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually;cynthia ramos, Individually;noreen boffa, Individually;onaney polanco, Individually;christopher neske, Individually;Abundio Sanchez, Individually;kentaro mizuta, Individually;akram kaiser, Individually;vinnie penna, Individually;nahoko mizuta, Individually;jhoana juca, Individually;john burgess, Individually;Rosa Zayas, Individually;yvonne davis, Individually ;andrea phillips, Individually;paul hinton, Individually The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; Capitalization errors corrected; Individually removed as last name. (dnh)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #16 Status Report, filed by Nahoko Mizuta, Edwin Zayas, Jose Garzon, Ceferino Paulino, Brenda Melendez, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rolando Cohen, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., andrea phillips, Individually, Luis Araujo, Akram Kaiser, Maria Hidalgo, Vinnie Penna, Eileen Mendez, john burgess, Individually, Lynn Chaperon, Andrea Phillips, Noreen Boffa, Claudia Rivas, Rhonda Ambrister, Jhoana Juca, Margarita Maria Rosas, Darren Ambrister, Yarely Mora, Christopher Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Michael Erde, nahoko mizuta, Individually, Fatima Mahrukh, Marilyn Beckford, Dorothy Neske, akram kaiser, Individually, Linda Larach-Cohen, Donna Cornett, John Burgess, Patrick Donohue, Kentaro Mizuta, Linda Larach-Cohen, Victor Arteaga, Luis Nunez, Sr., Maria Navarro-Carrillo, jhoana juca, Individually, Arelis Araujo, Paul Hinton, Alexandra Fiallos, Susanne Erde, vinnie penna, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Marina Perez, Abdon Lopez, Abundio Sanchez, Cynthia Ramos, Onaney Polanco, paul hinton, Individually, Janice Torres, yvonne davis, Individually, Yvonne Davis, Carolyn Mason, Justine Ferreira, Shannon Thomason, Rosa Zayas, Individually. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. By September 15, 2020, Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause, Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 6). By September 16, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file a letter stating whether they intend to file a reply. By September 21, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file any reply. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 9/15/2020, Replies due by 9/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/9/2020) (jca)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Individually, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, darren ambrister, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, arelis araujo, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, victor arteaga, Individually, marilyn beckford, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, john burgess, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, patrick donohue, Individually, michael erde, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, alexandra fiallos, Individually, jose garzon, Individually, paul hinton, Individually, jhoana juca, Individually, akram kaiser, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, eileen mendez, Individually, kentaro mizuta, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, christopher neske, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually, ceferino paulino, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, marina perez, Individually, andrea phillips, Individually, onaney polanco, Individually, cynthia ramos, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, shannon thomason, Individually, janice torres, Individually..(Albert, Peter)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(dnh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #10 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Individually, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, darren ambrister, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, arelis araujo, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, victor arteaga, Individually, marilyn beckford, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, john burgess, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, patrick donohue, Individually, michael erde, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, alexandra fiallos, Individually, jose garzon, Individually, paul hinton, Individually, jhoana juca, Individually, akram kaiser, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, eileen mendez, Individually, kentaro mizuta, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, christopher neske, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually, ceferino paulino, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, marina perez, Individually, andrea phillips, Individually, onaney polanco, Individually, cynthia ramos, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, shannon thomason, Individually, janice torres, Individually..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons,,,,,,,,,,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption title does not include all plaintiffs. Write et al. after the first listed plaintiff if all parties do not fit;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER with respect to #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause; with respect to #6 Motion for TRO; with respect to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall take all steps necessary to effect proper service as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 307 of the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules, or to notify Defendant of the action and request waiver of service. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status letter proposing a briefing schedule for the remaining submissions by September 8, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendant through electronic service as soon as possible, and no later than September 4, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/3/2020) (kv)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #10 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Justine Ferreira, Individually, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, darren ambrister, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, arelis araujo, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, victor arteaga, Individually, marilyn beckford, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, john burgess, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, patrick donohue, Individually, michael erde, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, alexandra fiallos, Individually, jose garzon, Individually, paul hinton, Individually, jhoana juca, Individually, akram kaiser, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, eileen mendez, Individually, kentaro mizuta, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, christopher neske, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually, ceferino paulino, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, marina perez, Individually, andrea phillips, Individually, onaney polanco, Individually, cynthia ramos, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, shannon thomason, Individually, janice torres, Individually..(Ashanti, Karl) Modified on 9/4/2020 (pc).
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. Document filed by Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Abdon Lopez, Victor Arteaga, paul hinton, Individually, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Luis Araujo, arelis araujo, Individually, Yvonne Davis, victor arteaga, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, Rhonda Ambrister, Noreen Boffa, Claudia Rivas, Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, michael erde, Individually, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Christopher Neske, Cynthia Ramos, eileen mendez, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, Janice Torres, Yarely Mora, Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), jhoana juca, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, Michael Erde, shannon thomason, Individually, Maria Hidalgo, Carolyn Mason, Jose Garzon, Alexandra Fiallos, ceferino paulino, Individually, Justine Ferreira, alexandra fiallos, Individually, Ceferino Paulino, Lynn Chaperon, kentaro mizuta, Individually, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Paul Hinton, Marina Perez, Dorothy Neske, Abundio Sanchez, Darren Ambrister, akram kaiser, Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Fatima Mahrukh, andrea phillips, Individually, Rosa Zayas, marilyn beckford, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, Edwin Zayas, Patrick Donohue, Justine Ferreira, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, Eileen Mendez, onaney polanco, Individually, Brenda Melendez, Marilyn Beckford, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, marina perez, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, john burgess, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, Rosa Elba De Paulino, christopher neske, Individually, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, John Burgess, darren ambrister, Individually, janice torres, Individually, Akram Kaiser, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, Linda Larach-Cohen, Jhoana Juca, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, Onaney Polanco, Donna Cornett, jose garzon, Individually, Arelis Araujo, Luis Nunez, Sr., cynthia ramos, Individually, Andrea Phillips, Susanne Erde, Vinnie Penna, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), patrick donohue, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, Shannon Thomason, Rolando Cohen, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 3, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners darren ambrister, Individually, victor arteaga, Individually, michael erde, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, Justine Ferreira, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, marina perez, Individually, marilyn beckford, Individually, arelis araujo, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, ceferino paulino, Individually, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, shannon thomason, Individually, patrick donohue, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, janice torres, Individually, alexandra fiallos, Individually, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, eileen mendez, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, jose garzon, Individually, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, cynthia ramos, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, onaney polanco, Individually, christopher neske, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, kentaro mizuta, Individually, akram kaiser, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, jhoana juca, Individually, john burgess, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, andrea phillips, Individually, paul hinton, Individually added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by darren ambrister, Individually, victor arteaga, Individually, michael erde, Individually, claudia rivas, Individually, Justine Ferreira, Individually, rhonda ambrister, Individually, donna cornett, Individually, rolando cohen, Individually, Edwin Zayas, Individually, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Individually, lynn chaperon, Individually, luis araujo, Individually, marina perez, Individually, marilyn beckford, Individually, arelis araujo, Individually, susanne erde, Individually, ceferino paulino, Individually, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Individually, shannon thomason, Individually, patrick donohue, Individually, carolyn mason, Individually, fatima mahrukh, Individually, brenda melendez, Individually, janice torres, Individually, alexandra fiallos, Individually, Maria Hidalgo, Individually, eileen mendez, Individually, yarely mora, Individually, Margarita Maria Rosas, Individually, abdon lopez, Individually, jose garzon, Individually, Linda Larach-Cohen, Individually, dorothy neske, Individually, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Individually, Luis Nunez, Sr., Individually, cynthia ramos, Individually, noreen boffa, Individually, onaney polanco, Individually, christopher neske, Individually, Abundio Sanchez, Individually, kentaro mizuta, Individually, akram kaiser, Individually, vinnie penna, Individually, nahoko mizuta, Individually, jhoana juca, Individually, john burgess, Individually, Rosa Zayas, Individually, yvonne davis, Individually, andrea phillips, Individually, paul hinton, Individually. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order served on New York City Department of Education on September 2, 2020. Service was made by Mail (Electronic Mail by Consent). Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karl Ashanti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ALL PLAINTIFFS. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (The additional plaintiffs need to be added in their INDIVIDUAL capacities ). (gp)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Karl J. Ashanti, Esq. in Support re: #6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause . MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG).(Ashanti, Karl)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION for Order to Show Cause ., MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ., MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, John Burgess, Lynn Chaperon, Rolando Cohen, Donna Cornett, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Paul Hinton, Jhoana Juca, Akram Kaiser, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Fatima Mahrukh, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M), Kentaro Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.K.M.,), Nahoko Mizuta(Parents and Natural Guardians of Y.R.M.,), Yarely Mora, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Ceferino Paulino, Vinnie Penna, Marina Perez, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Margarita Maria Rosas, Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, Rosa Zayas..(Ashanti, Karl)
September 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 2, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 20cv5085 and declined by Judge J Paul Oetken and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Add parties as instructed and then re-file the pleading before requesting an issuance of summons. All of the filers must be selected in the docket entry text. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karl Ashanti re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF.ADD ALL THE PLAINTIFF IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY. (Add individually on the party text line when adding the Plaintiffs). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (gp)
September 1, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karl Ashanti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Darren Ambrister, Rhonda Ambrister, Marilyn Beckford, Noreen Boffa, Lynn Chaperon, Paul Hinton, Akram Kaiser, Fatima Mahrukh, Maria Navarro-Carrillo, Ceferino Paulino Marina Perez, Margarita Maria Rosas, Rosa Zayas The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arelis Araujo, Luis Araujo, Victor Arteaga, John Burgess, Rolando Cohen, Yvonne Davis, Rosa Elba De Paulino, Patrick Donohue, Michael Erde, Susanne Erde, Justine Ferreira, Alexandra Fiallos, Jose Garzon, Maria Hidalgo, Jhoana Juca, Linda Larach-Cohen, Abdon Lopez, Carolyn Mason, Brenda Melendez, Eileen Mendez, Kentaro Mizuta, Nahoko Mizuta, Yarely Mora, Christopher Neske, Dorothy Neske, Luis Nunez, Sr., Vinnie Penna, Andrea Phillips, Onaney Polanco, Cynthia Ramos, Claudia Rivas, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Abundio Sanchez, Shannon Thomason, Janice Torres, Edwin Zayas, darren ambrister, rhonda ambrister, marilyn beckford, noreen boffa, lynn chaperon, Donna cornett, paul hinton, akram kaiser, fatima mahrukh, maria navarro-carrillo, ceferino paulino, marina perez, margarita maria rosas, rosa zayas..(Ashanti, Karl) Modified on 9/1/2020 (dnh).
August 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. If the entire caption does not fit, list the leading party followed by 'et al.' All of the filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons; Add all of the parties to CM/ECF and select all of the filers for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners rosa zayas, Nahoko Mizuta, Abdon Lopez, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Luis Araujo, Edwin Zayas, Yvonne Davis, Patrick Donohue, rhonda ambrister, noreen boffa, Claudia Rivas, Eileen Mendez, Brenda Melendez, marilyn beckford, Christopher Neske, Cynthia Ramos, Rosa Elba De Paulino, maria navarro-carrillo, John Burgess, Janice Torres, Yarely Mora, akram kaiser, Michael Erde, Jhoana Juca, Linda Larach-Cohen, Onaney Polanco, Donna cornett, Maria Hidalgo, Carolyn Mason, Jose Garzon, Alexandra Fiallos, Justine Ferreira, Arelis Araujo, Luis Nunez, Sr., Andrea Phillips, ceferino paulino, lynn chaperon, Susanne Erde, paul hinton, Vinnie Penna, marina perez, Kentaro Mizuta, Dorothy Neske, darren ambrister, Shannon Thomason, Abundio Sanchez, Rolando Cohen, margarita maria rosas, fatima mahrukh added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by rosa zayas, Nahoko Mizuta, Abdon Lopez, Nicholas Rojas, Sr., Luis Araujo, Edwin Zayas, Yvonne Davis, Patrick Donohue, rhonda ambrister, noreen boffa, Claudia Rivas, Eileen Mendez, Brenda Melendez, marilyn beckford, Christopher Neske, Cynthia Ramos, Rosa Elba De Paulino, maria navarro-carrillo, John Burgess, Janice Torres, Yarely Mora, akram kaiser, Michael Erde, Jhoana Juca, Linda Larach-Cohen, Onaney Polanco, Donna cornett, Maria Hidalgo, Carolyn Mason, Jose Garzon, Alexandra Fiallos, Justine Ferreira, Arelis Araujo, Luis Nunez, Sr., Andrea Phillips, ceferino paulino, lynn chaperon, Susanne Erde, paul hinton, Vinnie Penna, marina perez, Kentaro Mizuta, Dorothy Neske, darren ambrister, Shannon Thomason, Abundio Sanchez, Rolando Cohen, margarita maria rosas, fatima mahrukh. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Ashanti, Karl)
August 31, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge J. Paul Oetken as possibly related to 1:20-cv-05085-JPO. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 31, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
August 31, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Arelis Araujo added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Arelis Araujo. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Ashanti, Karl)
August 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 440 (Civil Rights: Other). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 448 (Civil Rights: Education). (dnh)
August 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; all parties must be added to the docket in each capacity as listed in the caption on the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
August 31, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karl Joseph Ashanti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: arelis araujo, New York City Department Of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-5085 (JPO). Document filed by arelis araujo..(Ashanti, Karl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by arelis araujo..(Ashanti, Karl) Modified on 8/31/2020 (dnh).
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ashanti, Karl)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against arelis araujo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21385436)Document filed by arelis araujo..(Ashanti, Karl) Modified on 9/1/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arelis Araujo, et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education ("DOE")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: arelis araujo
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Erde
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Mahrukh
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Cornett
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yarely Mora
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Cohen
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Torres
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceferino Paulino
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Neske
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Nunez, Sr.
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram Kaiser
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Boffa
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdon Lopez
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita Maria Rosas
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentaro Mizuta
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Navarro-Carrillo
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Elba De Paulino
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Araujo
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Mason
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Beckford
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hinton
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Zayas
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Donohue
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhoana Juca
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Ambrister
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Ambrister
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Thomason
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Arteaga
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Perez
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rojas, Sr.
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Rivas
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Zayas
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Ferreira
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garzon
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinnie Penna
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Davis
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahoko Mizuta
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Mendez
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Phillips
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Melendez
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Chaperon
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Hidalgo
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Larach-Cohen
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Burgess
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Neske
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Linda Larach-Cohen
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onaney Polanco
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ramos
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abundio Sanchez
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Fiallos
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Erde
Represented By: Karl Joseph Ashanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?