Reliability Incorporated v. Doki et al
Plaintiff: reliability incorporated
Defendant: SHIRISHA JANUMPALLY, kaylan PATHURRI, Federal Systems, vaneem doki, Kaylyan Pathurri and Naveen Doki
Case Number: 1:2020cv07109
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri..(Kendall, Glen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Glen A. Kendall in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA).(Kendall, Glen)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri. Responses due by 12/4/2020.(Kendall, Glen)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #11 Letter, filed by Reliability Incorporated. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter seeking a conference to discuss its anticipated motion to dismiss (Dkt. #10}, and Plaintiff's response (Dkt. #11). Having carefully considered the parties' submissions, the Court believes that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary at this time. Instead, the Court believes the most expedient course of action is to schedule Defendants' motion to dismiss. Should Defendants' motion be unsuccessful, the Court will then deal with scheduling briefing for the petition to compel arbitration. With that said, the Court ORDERS the following schedule: Defendants' opening papers are due on or before October 30, 2020; Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before December 4, 2020; and Defendants' reply is due on or before December 18, 2020. (Motions due by 10/30/2020., Responses due by 12/4/2020, Replies due by 12/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/25/2020) (rro)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kerrin T. Klein dated September 24, 2020 re: in response to Defendants September 21, 2020 letter (Dkt. No. 10). Document filed by Reliability Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Klein, Kerrin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from jonathan davidoff dated 09/21/2020 re: pre motion conference. Document filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri..(Davidoff, Jonathan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Glen Alan Kendall on behalf of Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri..(Kendall, Glen)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #5 Letter Motion to Expedite. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter seeking either a finding that Defendants are in default or setting an expedited briefing schedule for Plaintiff's petition to compel arbitration (Dkt. #5), Defendants' responsive letter (Dkt. #6), and Plaintiff's reply (Dkt. #7). Having carefully considered the parties' submissions, the Court does not believe that it would be appropriate to grant either request at this time. While the Court is sympathetic to Plaintiff's concerns regarding Defendants' failure to respond in a timely manner to the state court's order to show cause and the subsequent removal to this Court, the Court does not believe that a finding of default is warranted on the present record. Moreover, given Defendants' representation that it intends to file a pre-motion letter, the Court does not think it would be an efficient use of the parties' or the Court's resources to schedule briefing for the petition to compel arbitration. Instead, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's requests. The Court will wait for Defendants' pre-motion letter - which it expects to be filed in due course - and will determine next steps from there.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/8/2020) (rro) Modified on 9/8/2020 (rro).
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kerrin T. Klein dated 9/4/2020 re: certain misstatements made in the September 3, 2020 letter from counsel for Defendants (Dkt. No. 6). Document filed by Reliability Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Fleming, Thomas)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from jonathan davidoff dated 9/3/2020 re: response to letter from plaintiff. Document filed by Naveen Doki, Federal Systems, Shirisha Janumpally, Kaylyan Pathurri..(Davidoff, Jonathan)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Petition to Compel Arbitration or Grant Petition Due to Defendants' Default addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kerrin T. Klein dated September 2, 2020. Document filed by Reliability Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order to Show Cause).(Klein, Kerrin)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 Amended Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the All Defendant radio button was selected; the initial pleading deficiency must be cured before an Amended pleading is accepted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: vaneem doki; kaylan PATHURRI; SHIRISHA JANUMPALLY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 896 (Other Statutes: Arbitration); Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $2,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 190 (Contract: Other); the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Marc Davidoff to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Silvija Valleru, Shirisha Janumpally with party text 'individually', and, Kaylyan Pathurri with party text 'individually'; all of the filers were not selected for the pleading; pursuant to Rule 13.3, exhibits must be filed as attachments to the pleading and must be labeled (i.e. Summons and Complaint). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants ; amending #1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by SHIRISHA JANUMPALLY, kaylan PATHURRI, vaneem doki, Federal Systems. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Davidoff, Jonathan) Modified on 9/2/2020 (jgo).
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas James Fleming on behalf of reliability incorporated..(Fleming, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerrin Teneyck Klein on behalf of reliability incorporated..(Klein, Kerrin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBIT ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from new york supreme court, County of new york. Case Number: 653529/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21429670).Document filed by SHIRISHA JANUMPALLY, kaylan PATHURRI, vaneem doki, Federal Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(Davidoff, Jonathan) Modified on 9/2/2020 (jgo). .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reliability Incorporated v. Doki et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIRISHA JANUMPALLY
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Represented By: Glen Alan Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kaylan PATHURRI
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Systems
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Represented By: Glen Alan Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vaneem doki
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaylyan Pathurri
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Represented By: Glen Alan Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naveen Doki
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Davidoff
Represented By: Glen Alan Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: reliability incorporated
Represented By: Kerrin Teneyck Klein
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?