Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Pavel Partition Installers, Inc.
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund and The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Respondent: Pavel Partition Installers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07137
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Conference Order issued by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on October 15, 2020 served on Pavel Partition Installers, Inc. on October 19, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: A petition to confirm an arbitration award having been filed with the Court pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 9, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Petitioner(s) must serve a copy of this Initial Conference Order within fourteen (14) calendar days following the date of this order, on each Respondent that has already been served with the summons and complaint, that a copy of this Initial Conference Order must be served with any subsequent process that brings in additional parties, and that proof of such service must be filed promptly with the Court. It is further ORDERED that, in the event Respondent serves and files opposition to the petition, or Petitioner fails to file and serve the application described above, a conference shall be held in the above-captioned matter on December 4, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/15/2020) (cf)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, served. Pavel Partition Installers, Inc. served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Service was accepted by Yoltic Villalobos, Managing Agent. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pavel Partition Installers, Inc...(jgo)
September 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pavel Partition Installers, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21450628).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Signature Pages, #2 2011-2015 Independent Agreement, #3 Extension Agreement, #4 2017-2024 Independent Agreement, #5 Collection Policy, #6 Notice of Hearing, #7 Arbitration Award, #8 History Bill, #9 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Pavel Partition Installers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pavel Partition Installers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?