The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc. et al v. Multimedia System Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc. and Academy of Television Arts & Sciences
Defendant: CROWDSOURCE THE TRUTH, MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM DESIGN, INC. and Multimedia System Design, Inc. doing business as Crowdsource the Truth
Counter Claimant: Jason Goodman
Case Number: 1:2020cv07269
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. The parties are briefing motions to dismiss and would like a settlement conference as soon as possible. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/30/2020) (rro)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants' motion to dismiss is due by November 13, 2020. Plaintiffs' opposition and cross-motion to dismiss Defendants' counterclaims is due by December 11, 2020. Plaintiffs' may instead choose to file an amended complaint by December 11, 2020. Defendants' reply in support of its motion to dismiss and its response to Plaintiffs' cross-motion to dismiss Defendants' counterclaims is due by January 8, 2021. Defendants' may instead choose to file amended counterclaims by January 8, 2021. Plaintiffs' reply in support of its cross-motion to dismiss Defendants' counterclaims is due by January 29, 2021. Initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) shall be completed no later than November 13, 2020. The fact discovery deadline is March 5, 2021. The expert discovery deadline is May 21, 2021. A pretrial conference will be held on March 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. A referral to Magistrate Judge Wang for a settlement conference will be entered separately. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2021. Motions due by 11/13/2020. Cross Motions due by 12/11/2020. Responses due by 1/8/2021 Replies due by 1/29/2021. Fact Discovery due by 3/5/2021. Expert Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/30/2020) (rro)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The teleconference will be held as scheduled on October 30, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. The parties must appear for the conference by dialing 888-363-4749, using the access code 3121171, and the security code 7269. Plaintiffs' counsel may participate in the conference even if the pro hac vice motions have not been granted. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2020) (rro)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Samuel V. Eichner dated 10/22/2020 re: D.I. 7. Document filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc...(Eichner, Samuel)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Multimedia System Design, Inc...(Snyder, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc.. Document filed by Multimedia System Design, Inc., Jason Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- CIA and the Media).(Snyder, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Sixth Causes of Action. Document filed by Multimedia System Design, Inc...(Snyder, John)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Multimedia System Design, Inc.. (sj)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED LITIGATION: SWEIGERT V. GOODMAN SDNY CIVIL CASE#: 1:18-CV-08653-VEC re: that this action be filed as related to 20cv8653. (rro)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Multimedia System Design, Inc. d/b/a Crowdsource the Truth, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc...(Eichner, Samuel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on October 30, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 7269. Initial Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/11/2020) (nb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eichner, Samuel)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Samuel Van Eichner. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: CROWDSOURCE THE TRUTH. Alias was added to the case as a separate party in error. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samuel Van Eichner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Multimedia System Design, Inc., Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21569675..(Eichner, Samuel)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ATTORNEY SAMUEL EICHNER ATTEMPTED TO MAKE PAYMENT FOR THIS CASE. THE ATTEMPTS WERE UNSUCCESSFUL. CIVIL CASE OPENINGS WILL REACH OUT TO MR. EICHNER..(gp)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Samuel Van Eichner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MULTIPLE NATURE OF SUIT SELECTIONS MADE; REMOVE SELECTION OF 820 FROM CIVIL COVER SHEET. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the corrected PDF. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00..(Eichner, Samuel)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Samuel Van Eichner. Civil Case Opening Fee of $400 Due: for #1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 9/14/2020..(pne)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00..(Eichner, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Academy of Television Arts & Sciences, The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc...(Eichner, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Eichner, Samuel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR -CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Eichner, Samuel) Modified on 9/9/2020 (pne).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CROWDSOURCE THE TRUTH, MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM DESIGN, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00.)Document filed by The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc., Academy of Television Arts & Sciences..(Eichner, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc. et al v. Multimedia System Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROWDSOURCE THE TRUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIMEDIA SYSTEM DESIGN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multimedia System Design, Inc. doing business as Crowdsource the Truth
Represented By: John Hoover Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The National Academy of Television Arts and Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Van Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Academy of Television Arts & Sciences
Represented By: Samuel Van Eichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jason Goodman
Represented By: John Hoover Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?