Hao v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr Feng Hao and Feng Hao
Defendant: Prodigy Network, LLC and 17 John Preferred, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07295
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Prodigy Network LLC, and 17 John Preferred Inc., issued November 4, 2020.(dt)
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIRMATION of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support re: #14 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Feng Hao. (Attachments: #1 Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Feng Hao..(Kramer, Katherine) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Katherine Kramer to RE-FILE Document #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc ., #13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc. .. ERROR(S): Have to file the Documents separately. The only documents that you have to file for the Clerk's Certificate of Default is (1) the Clerk's Certificate of Default using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders, then (2) separately file the Affirmation in Support with the Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default as an attachment, using the event type Affirmation in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc. . Document filed by Feng Hao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support Request Clerk's Certificate of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dt).
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc . Document filed by Feng Hao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default Order).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dt).
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/5/2020) (kv)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prodigy Network, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Feng Hao..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rongping Wu on behalf of Feng Hao..(Wu, Rongping)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 17 John Preferred, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Feng Hao..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Katherine Burghardt Kramer on behalf of Feng Hao. New Address: DGW Kramer LLP, One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060, New York, New York, United States of America 10020, (917) 633-6860..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Network, LLC..(jgo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 17 John Preferred, Inc...(jgo)
September 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Feng Hao; Prodigy Network, LLC; 17 John Preferred, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 17 John Preferred, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Feng Hao..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Network, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Feng Hao..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 17 John Preferred, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21541182)Document filed by Feng Hao..(Burghardt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hao v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17 John Preferred, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Feng Hao
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feng Hao
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Represented By: Rongping Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?