Wang v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mr. PENG WANG and Peng Wang
Defendant: Prodigy Network, LLC, 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc., 17 John Preferred, Inc. and 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07297
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc., 1234 W Randolph NewCo Inc., and 1400 N Orleans NewCo Inc., issued November 4, 2020.(dt)
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIRMATION of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support re: #19 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Peng Wang. (Attachments: #1 Request for Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Peng Wang..(Kramer, Katherine) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc., 1234 W Randolph NewCo Inc., 1400 N Orleans NewCo Inc. . Document filed by Peng Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support Request Clerk's Certificate of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dt).
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Entry of Default as to Prodigy Network LLC, 17 John Preferred Inc., 1234 W Randolph NewCo Inc., 1400 N Orleans NewCo Inc. . Document filed by Peng Wang. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Katherine Burghardt Kramer in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default Order).(Kramer, Katherine) Modified on 11/4/2020 (dt).
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Prodigy Network, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Peng Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rongping Wu on behalf of Peng Wang..(Wu, Rongping)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 17 John Preferred, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Peng Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Peng Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent of Registered Agent. Document filed by Peng Wang..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Katherine Burghardt Kramer on behalf of Peng Wang. New Address: DGW Kramer LLP, One Rockefeller Plaza, Suite 1060, New York, New York, United States of America 10020, (917) 633-6860..(Kramer, Katherine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prodigy Network, LLC..(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 17 John Preferred, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc...(pc)
September 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Katherine Burghardt Kramer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mr. PENG WANG, 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc., 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc., 17 John Preferred, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PENG WANG..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PENG WANG..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 17 John Preferred, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PENG WANG..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prodigy Network, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by PENG WANG..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burghardt, Katherine)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc., 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc., 17 John Preferred, Inc., Prodigy Network, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21541817)Document filed by PENG WANG..(Burghardt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Prodigy Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodigy Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1234 W Randolph NewCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17 John Preferred, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1400 N Orleans NewCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. PENG WANG
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peng Wang
Represented By: Katherine Burghardt Kramer
Represented By: Rongping Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?