Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC, Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, LLC, Abbvie, Inc. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2020cv07304
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (wt)
October 13, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL.. (rro)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION & ORDER re: (35 in 1:20-cv-05826-LJL) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order and Request for Guidance re: End-Payor Plaintiffs' Leadership Applications addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Sharon Robertson dated September 3, 2 filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby: ORDERED that the motion to appoint Sharon K. Robertson of Cohen Milstein and Robin van der Muelen of Labaton Sucharow as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the putative class is GRANTED. Cohen Milstein and Labaton Sucharow will be responsible for the overall conduct of the litigation on behalf of the putative class of End-Payor Plaintiffs, including providing supervision of all class Plaintiffs' counsel in this litigation. As Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, Cohen Milstein and Labaton Sucharow have the authority to: (As further set forth herein this Order.) It is further ORDERED that the motions by other counsel for appointment as interim class counsel for the putative End-Payor class are DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the motion to appoint interim class counsel for the putative Direct Purchaser class is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel may not delegate responsibility or assign legal work to other law firms without the prior approval of the Court. No firm to which to which Interim Co-Lead Counsel delegates responsibility, when delegating with the approval of the Court, may further sub-delegate the work without the prior approval of interim co-lead counsel and the Court. It is further ORDERED that an Initial Pretrial Conference will be held on October 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. At that date and time, the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code: 2123101). It is further ORDERED that, by October 22, 2020 at 5:00 p.m., interim class counsel for the End-Payor Actions and Defendants thereto, and counsel for the named plaintiff in the Direct Purchaser Actions and Defendants thereto, shall jointly file a single Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order which shall be filed in each of the Direct Purchaser Actions and in the consolidated End-Payor Action, No. 20-cv-5538, and shaLL include the following: (1) a uniform and identical date by which will be filed any amended complaint in the Direct Purchaser Actions and the consolidated amended complaint in the End-Payor Actions; (2) a uniform and identical date by which responsive papers will be due in both the Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Actions; (3) a uniform and identical briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss filed in either the Direct Purchaser or End-Payor Actions; (4) a uniform and identical schedule for discovery and post-discovery conferences and motions that will govern the Direct Purchaser and End-Payor Actions. All deadlines for filing responsive papers are adjourned pending further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that by October 22, 2020 at 5:00 p.m., counsel in the Direct Purchaser Actions shall file a letter with the Court stating whether the two Direct Purchaser Actions should be consolidated. It is further ORDERED that the End-Payor Actions be consolidated; the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to consolidate the following cases under No. 20-cv-5538: No. 20-cv-7580; No. 20-cv-7352; No. 20-cv-5837; No. 20-cv-5813; No. 20-cv-7492; No. 20-cv-5826; No. 20-cv-7309; No. 20-cv-5901; No. 20-cv-6769; No. 20-cv-7177; No. 20-cv-6647; No. 20-cv-7296; No. 20-cv-7304. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/13/2020) (va)
October 13, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. (va)
October 13, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21805552. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jayne A. Goldstein in Support, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Goldstein, Jayne)
September 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Jayne A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21805552. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 10, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05538-LJL. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ad)
September 10, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (ad)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore dated Sept. 9, 2020 re: Application for Appointment of Cohen Milstein as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Robertson, Sharon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jayne A. Goldstein dated September 9, 2020 re: In Support of the Application of Sharon K. Robertson and Robin van der Meulen for Appointment as Interim Co-Lead Counsel for the Proposed End-Payor Class. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund..(Rubinow, Laurie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC..(pc)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Laurie Rubinow. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
September 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Laurie Rubinow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $75,000,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 9, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis J. Liman as possibly related to 20cv5538. (pc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abbvie Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund..(Rubinow, Laurie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rubinow, Laurie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Laurie Rubinow re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-05538 (LJL). Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund..(Rubinow, Laurie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund..(Rubinow, Laurie)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abbvie, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd., Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd, Forest Laboratories, Inc., Forest Laboratories, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21546450)Document filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund..(Rubinow, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund v. Abbvie, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20 Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Ireland Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Applicant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?