Tecku et al v. YieldStreet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Finkelstein, LAWRENCE TJOK, ADRIENNE CERULO and MICHAEL TECKU
Defendant: MICHAEL WEISZ, YS ALTNOTES I LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC, YS ALTNOTES II LLC, YS Altnotes I, LLC and YS Altnotes II, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv07327
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Aaron M. Zeisler and Zeisler PLLC be and hereby are withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs in this matter. It is further ordered that Adolfo J. Anzola, Esq. of Sonn Law Group is substituted as counsel of record in place of Mr. Zeisler. So Ordered. Attorney Aaron Mark Zeisler terminated. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/30/2020) (js)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Aaron M. Zeisler to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Adrienne Cerulo, David Finkelstein, Michael Tecku, Lawrence Tjok. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dec of Aaron M. Zeisler per 1746, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Anzola, Adolfo)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Centner on behalf of Adrienne Cerulo, David Finkelstein, Michael Tecku, Lawrence Tjok..(Centner, Daniel)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This Court, having considered the parties' "Stipulation," hereby ORDERS that Defendants' response to the Complaint is due on November 20, 2020. If the Defendants submit a letter brief in accordance with Section II.B.1 of the Court's Individual Practices, the Plaintiffs' response to that letter shall be due on December 11, 2020. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/20/2020) (jca)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #10 Motion for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/2020) (js)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #11 Motion for John B. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/2020) (js)
October 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for John B. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22062543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for John B. Lawrence to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22062543. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Weisz, YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Lawrence, John)
October 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22062068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Jonathan A. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22062068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Weisz, YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Shapiro, Jonathan)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent YieldStreet Inc. for YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Management, LLC. Document filed by YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC..(Howard, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David M. Howard on behalf of Michael Weisz, YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC..(Howard, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Lawrence Tjok, David Finkelstein, Adrienne Cerulo, Michael Tecku. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order order on stipulation to waive service).(Anzola, Adolfo)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Weisz, YS Altnotes I, LLC, YS Altnotes II, LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC..(pne)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Yieldstreet Inc.; Yieldstreet Management LLC; YS Altnotes I LLC; YS Altnotes II LLC; and Michael Weisz, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Adrienne Cerulo, David Finkelstein, Michael Tecku, Lawrence Tjok..(Anzola, Adolfo)
September 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Aaron Mark Zeisler to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
September 11, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 11, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aaron Mark Zeisler. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: YS ALTNOTES I LLC; YS ALTNOTES II LLC; MICHAEL WEISZ; MICHAEL TECKU; David Finkelstein; LAWRENCE TJOK; ADRIENNE CERULO. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
September 11, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Aaron Mark Zeisler. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $100,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL WEISZ, YS ALTNOTES I LLC, YS ALTNOTES II LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC. Document filed by LAWRENCE TJOK, David Finkelstein, ADRIENNE CERULO, MICHAEL TECKU..(Zeisler, Aaron)
September 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Aaron Mark Zeisler to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties and must not include 'et al'. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 9/15/2020. (jgo)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zeisler, Aaron)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST FILING ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to YieldStreet Inc.; YieldStreet Management LLC; YS ALTNOTES I LLC; YS ALTNOTES II LLC; and Michael Weisz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by ADRIENNE CERULO, David Finkelstein, MICHAEL TECKU, LAWRENCE TJOK..(Zeisler, Aaron) Modified on 9/11/2020 (jgo).
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against YS ALTNOTES I LLC, YS ALTNOTES II LLC, YieldStreet Inc., YieldStreet Management, LLC, MICHAEL WEISZ. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21564634)Document filed by LAWRENCE TJOK, David Finkelstein, ADRIENNE CERULO, MICHAEL TECKU..(Zeisler, Aaron) Modified on 9/10/2020 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecku et al v. YieldStreet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL WEISZ
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: John B. Lawrence
Represented By: David M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YS ALTNOTES I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YieldStreet Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: John B. Lawrence
Represented By: David M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YieldStreet Management, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: John B. Lawrence
Represented By: David M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YS ALTNOTES II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YS Altnotes I, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: John B. Lawrence
Represented By: David M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YS Altnotes II, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Shapiro
Represented By: John B. Lawrence
Represented By: David M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Finkelstein
Represented By: Aaron Mark Zeisler
Represented By: Daniel Centner
Represented By: Adolfo J. Anzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE TJOK
Represented By: Aaron Mark Zeisler
Represented By: Daniel Centner
Represented By: Adolfo J. Anzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIENNE CERULO
Represented By: Aaron Mark Zeisler
Represented By: Daniel Centner
Represented By: Adolfo J. Anzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TECKU
Represented By: Aaron Mark Zeisler
Represented By: Daniel Centner
Represented By: Adolfo J. Anzola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?