Elleisy Jr. v. Wu et al
Plaintiff: Joe Elleisy Jr.
Defendant: James S. Cassano, Bing Yang, John Wallace, Harry Edelson, Federico Tovar, Jerry Fan, Robert G. Benya, Shane McMahon, Yang Chao, Kang Zhao, Zheng Wu, Steven Fadem, Conor McCarthy, Alfred Poor and Jin Shi
Nominal Defendant: Ideanomics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07482
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS: WHEREFORE, the parties, through their undersigned counsel, hereby agree, stipulate, and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order as follows: The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial, under Case No. 1:20-CV-05333 (the "Consolidated Action"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Action, or in any separate action included herein, must bear the following caption: IN RE IDEANOMICS, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 1:20-cv-05333. Co-Lead Counsel for plaintiffs for the conduct of the Consolidated Action shall be: THE BROWN LAW FIRM, P.C.; THE ROSEN LAW FIRM, P.A., and as further set forth in this stipulation. The Represented Individual Defendants hereby accept service of the complaint filed in the Elleisy Action ("Elleisy Complaint"). Ideanomics and the Represented Individual Defendants shall not be obligated to move, answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Elleisy Complaint (or any amended complaint, if one has been filed) at least until the Court rules on the Toorani Stay Stipulation (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-05333-GBD, 1:20-cv-07482-GBD (jwh)
October 2, 2020 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:20-cv-05333-GBD. (jwh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/22/2020) (nb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Ideanomics, Inc. served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. Service was accepted by Michelle Calkins - Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Joe Elleisy Jr...(Kim, Phillip)
September 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 18, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-05333-GBD. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert G. Benya, James S. Cassano, Yang Chao, Harry Edelson, Steven Fadem, Jerry Fan, Ideanomics, Inc., Conor McCarthy, Shane McMahon, Alfred Poor, Jin Shi, Federico Tovar, John Wallace, Zheng Wu, Bing Yang, Kang Zhao..(dnh)
September 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:20-cv-05333-GBD. (dnh)
September 14, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 14, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zheng Wu a/k/a Bruno Wu, Bing Yang, Robert G. Benya, Federico Tovar, Alfred Poor, Conor McCarthy, James S. Cassano, Harry Edelson, Steven Fadem, Jerry Fan, Shane McMahon, Jin Shi, John Wallace, Yang Chao, Kang Zhao, and Ideanomics, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Joe Elleisy Jr...(Kim, Phillip)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-05333-GBD. Document filed by Joe Elleisy Jr...(Kim, Phillip)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kim, Phillip)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert G. Benya, James S. Cassano, Yang Chao, Harry Edelson, Steven Fadem, Jerry Fan, Ideanomics, Inc., Conor McCarthy, Shane McMahon, Alfred Poor, Jin Shi, Federico Tovar, John Wallace, Zheng Wu, Bing Yang, Kang Zhao. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21617245)Document filed by Joe Elleisy Jr...(Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elleisy Jr. v. Wu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Cassano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bing Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federico Tovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Benya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kang Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zheng Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Fadem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conor McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Poor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jin Shi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Elleisy Jr.
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Ideanomics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?