Wallace v. The IM. Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carmela Wallace
Defendant: The IM. Group, LLC and Sean Welch
Case Number: 1:2020cv07610
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to the IM.Group, LLC.(km)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Jonathan D. Davis in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Williams, Derek)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Williams, Derek) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Sean Welch.. Service was attempted on 10/09/20. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Otto, Milton)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The IM. Group, LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. Service was accepted by J. Bean, Authorized Representative For Registered Agent, Nevada Management Team Ltd.. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Otto, Milton)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Welch. (sj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The IM. Group, LLC. (sj)
September 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
September 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
September 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan David Davis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Welch, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Davis, Jonathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The IM. Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Davis, Jonathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Davis, Jonathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The IM. Group, LLC, Sean Welch. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21690936)Document filed by Carmela Wallace..(Davis, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. The IM. Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmela Wallace
Represented By: Jonathan David Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The IM. Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?