Angeles v. Capita Snowboards LLC
Plaintiff: Jenisa Angeles
Defendant: Capita Snowboards LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv07690
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Capita Snowboards LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Force, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/22/2020) (rjm) Modified on 9/24/2020 (rjm).
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capita Snowboards LLC..(pne)
September 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
September 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne)
September 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Capita Snowboards LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Force, David)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Force, David)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capita Snowboards LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21724702)Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Force, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angeles v. Capita Snowboards LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capita Snowboards LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenisa Angeles
Represented By: David Paul Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?