Braithwaite et al v. Francois et al
Plaintiff: Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon and Paul Braithwaite
Defendant: David Keye, Shaun Francois, Mayra Vega, Willie Mitchell, Local 372 AFSCME, Antonio Jordan and Local 372
Case Number: 1:2020cv07736
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
September 28, 2020 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-07734-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
September 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Accordingly, the plaintiffs' motion to remand [ECF #5] is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remand this case back to the New York Supreme Court and then close this case. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/25/2020) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 25, 2020 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 37 1001 5788 on 9/25/2020..(rro)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing held on September 24, 2020 and in a forthcoming order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be remanded back to the New York Supreme Court [ECF #5]. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil) (Text Only Order)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order. . Document filed by Paul Braithwaite, Anthony Gordon..(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR REMAND: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on September 24, 2020 at 4:30 PM, the defendants shall show cause why this case should not be remanded back to the Supreme Court of New York [ECF #11]. Due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing shall be held by telephone. The hearing can be accessed by calling the Court's teleconference line at 888-278-0296 at the scheduled time. When prompted, enter Access Code 5195844. The Court will join once all of the parties are on the line. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/21/2020) ( Telephone Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 04:30 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil.) (ks)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Paul Braithwaite, Anthony Gordon..(Schwartz, Arthur) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIRMATION of Arthur Z. Schwartz, Exhibits 3 and 4 in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Schwartz State Court Affirmation in Support of TRO and OSC).(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIRMATION of Arthur Schwartz Exhibits 2-K to 2-M in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2-L - Exec. Bd Minutes 12-19-19, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-M - Judicial Panel Decision).(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Arthur Schwartz - Exhibit 2-J in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon..(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIRMATION of Arthur Schwartz -Continued Exhibits F-I in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2-G - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-H - AFSCME Member Bill of Rights, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2-I - AFSCME Model Local Constitution).(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIRMATION of Arthur Z. Schwartz in Support re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - State Court verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2-A Local 372 Constitution, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2-B1 - NY Times - Union Chief Accused of Embezzling, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2-B2 - NY Times - Ex-Union President Sentenced, #6 Exhibit Ex. 2-C - 2016 IRS 990, #7 Exhibit Ex. 2-D -2017 IRS 990, #8 Exhibit Ex. 2-E -2018 IRS 990).(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #11 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
September 21, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
September 21, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as possibly related to 1:20cv7734. (sj)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Roger V. Archibald. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Paul Braithwaite; Shaun Francois; David Keye; Antonio Jordan; Mayra Vega; Willis Mitchell; Local 372. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
September 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order. Use the event type Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief found under the event list Proposed Orders. (db)
September 21, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
September 20, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Remand filed by Order to Show Cause with a Proposed Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon..(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 9/21/2020 (db).
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Z Schwartz on behalf of Paul Brathwaite, Anthony Gordon..(Schwartz, Arthur)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-7734. Document filed by Local 372 AFSCME, Shaun Francois, Antonio Jordan, David Keye, Willie Mitchell, Mayra Vega. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Archibald, Roger)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Archibald, Roger)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 6544372020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21734423).Document filed by Mayra Vega, Local 372 AFSCME, David Keye, Shaun Francois, Willie Mitchell, Antonio Jordan..(Archibald, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braithwaite et al v. Francois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Keye
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Francois
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayra Vega
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Mitchell
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 372 AFSCME
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Jordan
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 372
Represented By: Roger V. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Brathwaite
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gordon
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Braithwaite
Represented By: Arthur Z Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?