Williams v. Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Logan Williams
Defendant: Chuck Hinckley, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC doing business as Marathon Capital, LLC, Phillippe Lavertu and Ted Brandt
Case Number: 1:2020cv07783
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Chuck Hinckley..(Shapiro, Peter)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy J. Mellk on behalf of Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Mellk, Wendy)
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Greg Anthony Riolo on behalf of Ted Brandt, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(Riolo, Greg)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah J. Arena on behalf of Logan Williams..(Arena, Sarah)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Ted Brandt, Chuck Hinckley, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Seal. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/30/20) (yv)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Seal Complaint (Dkt. No. 1) addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Michael J. Willemin dated September 29, 2020. Document filed by Logan Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Complaint).(Willemin, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ted Brandt..(jgo)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phillippe Lavertu..(jgo)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC..(jgo)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chuck Hinckley..(jgo)
September 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Phillippe Lavertu, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chuck Hinckley, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ted Brandt, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Willemin, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ted Brandt, Chuck Hinckley, Phillippe Lavertu, Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21776457)Document filed by Logan Williams..(Willemin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Hinckley
Represented By: Peter T. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Capital of Illinois, LLC doing business as Marathon Capital, LLC
Represented By: Greg Anthony Riolo
Represented By: Wendy J. Mellk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillippe Lavertu
Represented By: Greg Anthony Riolo
Represented By: Wendy J. Mellk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Brandt
Represented By: Greg Anthony Riolo
Represented By: Wendy J. Mellk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Williams
Represented By: Michael John Willemin
Represented By: Sarah J. Arena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?