Holmes v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: David Holmes
Defendant: JANE DOE, CHASE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, XYZ Companies, JOHN DOE, May Yeong, XYZ Entities 1 to 10, JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. and Jane and/or John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv07795
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CONSENT TO REMOVE TO ARBITRATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for the undersigned parties, that the above-entitled action shall be dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party from the current forum and removed to AAA arbitration. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/12/2020) (jwh)
November 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #14 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Jane and/or John Does 1-10, XYZ Entities 1 to 10, May Yeong(In Her Corporate Capacity), May Yeong(individually) and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by David Holmes. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Heck, Peter)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Peter Heck RE-FILE Document No. #13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation needs to have handwritten signatures of the attorneys. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Jane and/or John Does 1-10, XYZ Entities 1 to 10, May Yeong(In Her Corporate Capacity), May Yeong(individually) and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by David Holmes. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Heck, Peter) Modified on 11/2/2020 (km).
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Peter Heck. RE-FILE Document No. #12 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared (ink signatures). Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Jane and/or John Does 1-10, XYZ Entities 1 to 10, May Yeong(In Her Corporate Capacity), May Yeong(individually) and without costs. Document filed by David Holmes. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff...(Heck, Peter) Modified on 11/2/2020 (km).
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Peter Heck. RE-FILE Document No. #11 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. When Re-Filing the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal and you come to the question is this Stipulation of Voluntary dismissal pursuant to 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), select NO. (dt)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A., Jane and/or John Does 1-10, XYZ Entities 1 to 10, May Yeong(In Her Corporate Capacity), May Yeong(individually) and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by David Holmes. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Heck, Peter) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dt).
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A...(dnh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Holmes..(Heck, Peter)
September 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter John Heck to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the party name listed in the as to docket entry text and on the summons PDF must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Holmes..(Heck, Peter) Modified on 9/25/2020 (dnh).
September 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter John Heck. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: May Yeong. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 24, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Peter John Heck to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name is incorrect on the docket entry;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher E. Chang on behalf of David Holmes..(Chang, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heck, Peter)
September 23, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents May Yeong added. Party added pursuant to #2 Complaint.Document filed by David Holmes. Related document: #2 Complaint..(Heck, Peter)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to May Yeong..(pc)
September 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter John Heck. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Peter John Heck. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: JOHN DOE. The party was added to the case in error. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Peter John Heck re: Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add May Yeong to CM ECF with the party text "in her corporate capacity". Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Peter John Heck to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
September 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter John Heck. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: CHASE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, XYZ Companies, May Yeong. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to May Yeong, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Holmes..(Heck, Peter)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chase Bank (USA), N.A., re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by David Holmes..(Heck, Peter) Modified on 9/23/2020 (pc).
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CHASE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, XYZ Companies, May Yeong. Document filed by David Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Heck, Peter)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against David Holmes. Document filed by David Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Heck, Peter) Modified on 9/23/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK (USA), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Yeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Entities 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Holmes
Represented By: Peter John Heck
Represented By: Christopher E. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?