OFF-WHITE LLC v. ANOGAR-32 et al.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07892
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: For the reasons proffered in Plaintiff's memorandum of law dated November 6, 2020 (Docket Entry No. 40), and on the record during the telephonic show cause hearing conducted November 23, 2020, and for good cause shown, the preliminary inj unction order dated November 15, 2020 (Docket Entry No. 42), is modified solely to the extent that the amount of the bond required to be posted by Plaintiff is hereby reduced to $10,000, effective immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/23/2020) (ama)
November 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: This injunctive relief shall not apply to Defendants styleyourlifel, broshopping, niall_malik and jconejita19851. The injunctive relief previously granted in the TRO shall remain in place through the pendency of this lit igation, and issuing this Order is warranted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 and Section 34 of the Lanham Act. Accordingly, Defendants are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions pending the fin al hearing and determination of this action or until further order of the Court: as set forth herein. The 10,000.00 bond posted by Plaintiff shall remain with the Court until a final disposition of this case or until this Order is terminated. This Or der shall remain in effect during the pendency of this action, or until further order of the Court. Any Defendant that are subject to this Order may appear and move to dissolve or modify the Order on two (2) days' notice to Plaintiff or on shorter notice as set by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/13/2020) (ama) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ama).
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: The Court held a telephonic hearing this day on Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunctions in the above-captioned cases. Representatives from Defendants topshopping-18 (which was named in Case No. 20-CV-7892 but dismissed by Order of the Court, see Docket Entry No. 32) and Quality Products Manufacture Co., Ltd. (which was named in Case No. 20-CV-7894) appeared but did not oppose Plaintiff's requested relief. The Court granted the motions as to all remaining Defendants (exce pt Defendant GHH11 STORE, in Case No. 20-CV-7894, which has not been served), and directed Plaintiff to file revised proposed written orders, with Notices of Presentment, on the public docket. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a status report by t he earlier of (a) January 15, 2020, and (b) fourteen (14) days after the appearance of any Defendant in this action.Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on the remaining Defendants,and to file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/30/2020) (ama)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: A telephonic conference was held today in the above-captioned matters, at which Plaintiff appeared by counsel. There was no appearance for Defendants, who Plaintiff reports were served (with the exception of Defendant GHH11 STORE, in Case No. 20-CV-7894) on October 14, 2020, with the summons, complaint, and Temporary Restraining Order dated September 29, 2020, as well as the Court's October 13, 2020, orders extending the Temporary Restraining Order (Docket Entry Nos. 7, 20 in Case No . 20-CV-7892; Docket Entry Nos. 21, 23 in Case No. 20-CV-7894; and together the "TRO Orders"). Plaintiff's request to extend the provisions of the TRO Orders is granted (except as to Defendant GHH11 STORE, in Case No. 20-CV-7894, as to which it is denied), through the resolution of Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction. Except to the extent provided in the preceding sentence, the TRO Orders remain in effect pending resolution of the motions for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants, and to file proof of such service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/27/2020) (ama)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's request to extend the provisions of the TRO Order is granted through October 27, 2020. On October 27, 2020, at 2:00 p.m., the Court will hold an additional telephonic conference, at which the Court may entertain any applicatio n for further extension of the restraining provisions of the TRO Order. Participants may access the call by dialing 888-363-4734, entering the access code 1527005#, and the security code 1065#. As provided in the TRO Order, the Preliminary Injunction hearing will take place on October 30, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. To access the telephonic proceeding, the parties must dial 888-363-4734 and enter the access code 1527005#, followed by the security code 1065#. Defendants' opposing papers must be filed electronically by October 20, 2020, and any reply papers must be filed by October 26, 2020. The affidavits filed in support of the Preliminary Injunction (and any filed in opposition) will be considered direct testimony and any live testimony will b e limited to cross-examination and redirect. If there is an opposing evidentiary proffer, the parties must meet and confer regarding anticipated live testimony, if any, and logistical proposals therefor, and submit a joint status report to the Court by October 27, 2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Defendants, and to file proof of such service. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 10/20/2020, Replies due by 10/26/2020., Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain., Telephone Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/13/2020) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OFF-WHITE LLC v. ANOGAR-32 et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?