Englert v. Montablano
Petitioner: Donald Englert, John Englert and Bridget Englert
Respondent: Nicole Montablano
Case Number: 1:2020cv07904
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333ad
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: NOW, on motion of attorneys for Petitioners, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-described Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, with interest as aforesaid, filed by Petitioners for the benefit of any and all claimants as security representing the Petitioners' interest in the value of the vessel as of the date of the alleged incident, is hereby approved; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court, only upon motion and good cause shown, shall cause appraisement of the value of Petitioners' interest in the vessel on the date of the alleged incident, and may thereupon order said security increased or reduced if it finds the amount thereof insufficient or excessive; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Notice shall be issued by the Clerk of this Court to all persons, firms, entities or corporations, having any claim or suit against the Petitioners or their vessel with respect to which the Complaint seeks exoneration from or limitation of liability, admonishing them to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this Court, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/15/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cibinskas, Jocelyn)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION / COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY..Document filed by Donald Englert, John Englert, Bridget Englert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice).(Cibinskas, Jocelyn)
September 25, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
September 25, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
September 25, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
September 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Jocelyn Cibinskas. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
September 25, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jocelyn Cibinskas to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the docket must reflect a Respondent. Add the respondent to CM/ECF 'All Parties' Error; each of the parties as to whom the complaint is being filed against must be listed in the as to docket entry text. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Robert Federici on behalf of Bridget Englert, Donald Englert, John Englert..(Federici, Joseph)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Parties. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21830403)Document filed by Donald Englert, John Englert, Bridget Englert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet).(Cibinskas, Jocelyn) Modified on 9/25/2020 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Englert v. Montablano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Englert
Represented By: Jocelyn Cibinskas
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Englert
Represented By: Jocelyn Cibinskas
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bridget Englert
Represented By: Jocelyn Cibinskas
Represented By: Joseph Robert Federici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nicole Montablano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?