Castillo Rosario et al v. Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Carlos Castillo Rosario
Defendant: Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. d/b/a Lovely Twins doing business as d/b/a Lovely Twins, Danilo Cabrera, Wacal Soto, Wascar Soto and Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. doing business as Lovely Twins
Case Number: 1:2020cv07941
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty Authorized Agent. Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually); John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Ryan Tucker on behalf of John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Tucker, Clifford)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wascar Soto..(jgo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wacal Soto..(jgo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc...(jgo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danilo Cabrera..(jgo)
September 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wascar Soto, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danilo Cabrera, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wacal Soto, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danilo Cabrera, Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc., Wacal Soto, Wascar Soto. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21845425)Document filed by John Carlos Castillo Rosario(Individually), John Carlos Castillo Rosario(On behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo Rosario et al v. Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. d/b/a Lovely Twins doing business as d/b/a Lovely Twins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danilo Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacal Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wascar Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovely Twins Wines & Liquors Inc. doing business as Lovely Twins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carlos Castillo Rosario
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?