Genetec, Inc. v. PROS, Inc
Plaintiff: Genetec, Inc.
Defendant: PROS, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv07959
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Michael Doherty on behalf of PROS, Inc..(Doherty, John)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Paul R. Niehaus dated November 10, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss (Individual Rule 3.F). Document filed by Genetec, Inc...(Niehaus, Paul)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by PROS, Inc. Responses due by 11/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Defendant PROS, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Genetec, Inc.'s Complaint, #2 Declaration of John M. Doherty in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit the Complaint, #4 Exhibit Subscription Agreement, #5 Exhibit Subscription Order, #6 Exhibit Work Order, #7 Exhibit Change Order).(Katz, William)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/5/2020) (rro)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PROS, Inc..(pc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PROS, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Genetec, Inc...(Niehaus, Paul)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Genetec, Inc...(Niehaus, Paul)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Niehaus, Paul)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PROS, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21847772)Document filed by Genetec, Inc...(Niehaus, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genetec, Inc. v. PROS, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROS, Inc
Represented By: William Mayer Katz, Jr.
Represented By: John Michael Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genetec, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Robert Niehaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?