Silfa v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glenis Silfa
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, Teva Woman's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health LLC, Teva Women's Health LLC and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv07979
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David A Landman to RE-FILE Document #39 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
November 17, 2020 Filing 43 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Women's Health LLC. Document filed by Teva Women's Health LLC..(Landman, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Woman's Health, Inc.. Document filed by Teva Woman's Health, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 40 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Cooper Companies, Inc. for CooperSurgical, Inc.. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David) Modified on 11/23/2020 (ldi).
November 16, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney David A Landman to RE-FILE Document #32 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #33 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #28 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #29 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #27 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file these documents and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (ldi)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Rex Allen Littrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
November 13, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Rex Allen Littrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22577611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 13, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Rex Allen Littrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22577611. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Woman's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Littrell, Rex)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. On November 5, 2020, Plaintiff filed a letter requesting that the Court stay this case pending the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's determination of whether to consolidate and transfer Plaintiff's case with multiple other actions involving the ParaGard intrauterine device. The Court grants Plaintiff's request. Courts routinely grant stays pending an MDL panel's determination of whether to consolidate and transfer a case in order to conserve judicial resources. See Royal Park Investments SA/NV v. Bank of Am. Corp., 941 F. Supp. 2d 367, 370 (S.D.N.Y. 2013). Moreover, while Defendants contend that they oppose consolidation and transfer generally, they provide no reason why they would be harmed by a stay pending that decision. See Dkt. No. 35. Therefore, the Court will stay this litigation until the MDL panel has determined whether Plaintiffs claims will be consolidated and transferred. SO ORDERED. Granting #24 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert M. Hammers, Jr. dated 11/05/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken, sitting in Part I on 11/12/2020) (rjm)
November 9, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David A. Landman dated November 9, 2020 re: In Response to Plaintiff's Letter Motion of 11/5/2020 Requesting a Stay of Proceedings. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Woman's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 34 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David Landman dated November 6, 2020 re: Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Woman's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Teva Women's Health LLC..(Landman, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ldi).
November 6, 2020 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Teva Woman's Health, Inc...(Landman, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ldi).
November 6, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Teva Women's Health LLC..(Landman, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Teva Woman's Health, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc...(Landman, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ldi).
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc...(Landman, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ldi).
November 6, 2020 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 (ldi).
November 5, 2020 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Rex A. Littrell in Support re: #25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc... Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Landman, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 25 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc, The Cooper Companies, Inc. and CooperSurgical, Inc.. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert M. Hammers, Jr. dated 11/05/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Hammers, Robert)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A Landman on behalf of CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Woman's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David Landman dated November 4, 2020 re: Defendant's Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Woman's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc...(Landman, David)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Robert M. Hammers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (kwi)
October 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Robert M. Hammers, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22282476. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Robert M. Hammers, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22282476. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Glenis Silfa. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing).(Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The Cooper Companies, Inc. served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Teva Woman's Health, Inc. served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Teva Women's Health LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. CooperSurgical, Inc. served on 10/15/2020, answer due 11/5/2020. Service was accepted by A Legal Representative of the Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health LLC..(dnh)
October 8, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teva Women's Health. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Woman's Health, Inc...(dnh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc...(dnh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CooperSurgical, Inc...(dnh)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Cooper Companies, Inc...(dnh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Coopersurgical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi)
October 7, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons must be filed separately. Use one summons form and list each party on a separate rider.;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC; THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.; and COOPERSURGICAL, INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Glenis Silfa..(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 10/7/2020 (pc).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/5/2020) (ks)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi)
September 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 367 (Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharma. Personal Injury Product Liability); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 365 (Personal Inj. Prod. Liability); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State);. (pc)
September 28, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21851190)Document filed by Glenis Silfa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet).(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silfa v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: David A Landman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: David A Landman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Woman's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: David A Landman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: David A Landman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Represented By: David A Landman
Represented By: Rex Allen Littrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenis Silfa
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Robert M. Hammers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?