Santos et al v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Maria Santos and Jose Santos
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2020cv08012
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, January 15, 2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/7/2020) (rjm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(pc)
September 29, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
September 29, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
September 29, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
September 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney James Santiago Paglinawan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
September 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James Santiago Paglinawan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 22:2702; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
September 29, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Santiago Paglinawan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jose Santos, Maria Santos..(Paglinawan, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Document filed by Maria Santos, Jose Santos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Paglinawan, James) Modified on 9/29/2020 (pc).
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21873883)Document filed by Maria Santos, Jose Santos..(Paglinawan, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Santos
Represented By: James Santiago Paglinawan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Santos
Represented By: James Santiago Paglinawan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?