Bersoumm et al v. Aboteat et al
Plaintiff: Younan Gerges Fekri Younan, Hani Gaber Ramzi Mahani, Touab Nabil Henin, Waleed M. Abdelmegid, Hassan Adel Abdelwahab Mersal, Helmi Nazim Abdelhali Karam, Ahmed Mohammead Mahmoud, Melad Shauki Rashed Hana, Waheed Mankorios Micha Mankorios, Khaled Attia Saleh, Hesham Mohamed Mahmoud Al said, Gerges Rateb Ibrahim, Ahmed Mohamed Diaa El Ayoub, Andraous Fayes Daniel Shehata, Melad Ghaly Atia Ghaly, Abdlrahman Mohammed Afifi, Said Abdelazeem Hendi, Abdallah Asem Soliman, Sobhy Hamdi Fathy Gerges, Nashaat Bersoum Youssef Bersoum, Ibrahim Eskander Nazzem Karam, Boshra Farid Youssef Bersoum, Esmaeel Mohamed Ibrahim Mousa, Ramadan Gomaa Adellatif Al Said, Osama Mohamed Diaa El Ayoub, Youssef Saad Eskander Hana, Ahmed Sallah Attallah, Mohamed Fouda Al Atallah, Atef Nadi Habib Kamel, George Mahrous Adly Megali, Abdelsamea Abdelsamea Nassif, Gamel Ibrahim Awad Asaad, Samy Saad Mohamed Afify, Mahmoud Farid Algazar, Hamdy Gomma Ataia Abouarab, Reda Esaak Mata Gerges, Khaled Moustafa Fouda, Yasser Abdlealeem Mohammad, Shalaby Abdellatif Hossein, Mosaad Ali Ahmed Farag, Youssef Gerges Naeem Sorial, Mahmoud Ramadan Esmaeel Al Said, Nader Waheeb Khalil, Ahmed Al said Al said Ibrahim, Nagy Ihab Hassan Mohamed, Mohammad Sobhy Mokhtar, Abdelrahman Elsayed Nasr Hassan, Same Attia Ibrahim, Ahmed Abdelghany Mohamed, Sherif Touab Aziz, Tamer Hosain Hosain, Walead Ahmed Hassan, Gaber Ahmed Mohamed Youssef, Mohamed Tantawi Said Ali, Mata Younan Mata Gerges, Amer Isameil Bakr, Isalm Mohamed Mahmoud, Shaaban Ramadan Amar, Karam Samaan Ibrahim Awad, Khaled Alsaid Ibrahim, Mohamed Gaber Yousef, Gouda Mohamed Abou Elamayem, Adel Mostafa Ahmed Ameen, Melad Gaber Ramzi Mahani, Mohamed Fathi Elsayed, Masoud Atia Mokhtar Ibrahim, Sobhy Mohammad Ganab, Adel Aw Adaiiah Eskande Ibrahim, Botros Makram Abdou Estemalek, Mohammad Ibrahim Soliman Haroun, Emad Ayad Kamel Gerges, Kamal Mohamed Al said Youssef, Boulus Salah Shafik Karas, Salah Hasan Mohamed Ibrahim, Ali Shaban Hosain Gannab, Mostafa Elsaid Alhossany, Haytham Kamel Moustafa, Louka Younan Labib Tobia, Ahmed Shaaban Husain Ganab, Aid Mokhtar Ibrahim, Yehia Said Mohammad, Ahmed Mohammad Abdelbaset, Ibrahim Farag Akila Moftah, Moustafa Ahmed Elkilany, Alaa Masoud Ali Mousa, Makarios Hamdi Mata Gerges, Mohamed Mohamed Hosain Gannab, Sami Ramzi Nashed Henin, Mohamed Ebrahim Saad, Reda Sabet Gali Ambarek, Elsaid Mohammad Alkheir, Mohammad Ali Sharabia, Gomaa Ebaid Zedan, Amgad Makar Zaki Kamel, Mena Medhat Khamis Mata, Alaa Said Abedallat Husain, Abanob Makram Askander Botros, Hani Romani Zekery Magali, Esaak Samir Ferez Gamel, Salah Labib Ashraf Bahr, Abdelsalam Mohamed Mahmoud Alsaid, Hesham Khaled Elsayed, Moataz Ahmed Alserag, Mohamed Dahy Abdelhamid Ahmed, Essam Adel Mohamed Hassan, Hani Andraous Nasif Hana, Mohamed Reda Bedir, Ibrahim Shaouki Ibrahim Youssef, Salah Hussein Ibrahim, Emil Samir Basit Henin, Yassin Mohammad Nassef, Mohammad Abdallah Haroun, Reda Saad Mohamed, Islam Sobhi Ibrahim, Mohammad Elsaid Ibrahim, Mahmoud Kamel Mohamed Nasar, Moatez Ahmed; Fathy, Emad Mohamed Abdalla Arafa, Mohamed Moursy Abouarab, Nosehy Gabaiiah Zekry Kamel, Waal Mohamed Mahmoud Al Said, Hani Said Abedellati Hendi, Ahmed Gomma Ataia Abouarab, Ahmed Ashraf Ali, Gerges Sedik Fahmi Megali, Alaa Gomaa Al Said, Fathi Mohamed Youssef Selim and Mohamed Ahmed Hosain
Defendant: Ibrahim Omar Dabbashi, Mustafa T. A. Aboteat, COLONEL Ahmed Abouzeid Al Mismari, Fayez Al-Sarraj and Al-Mahdi Hassan Muftah Allabad
Case Number: 1:2020cv08013
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must participate in a telephone conference on 1/22/2021 at 11:30 a.m. Parties should dial in at 1(888)363-4749, access code (9054506) to join the conference. (Telephone Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon. Initial Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/14/2020) (mml)
September 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sjo)
September 28, 2020 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
September 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo)
September 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
September 28, 2020 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:18-cv-03588. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. #30 ) IS GRANTED AND THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE US DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 8/13/20.8/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Transfer to a Different Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. Section 1406(a) filed by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Certificate of Service)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants : MOTION HEARING RESET FOR 8/26/2020 11:00 AM IN Philadelphia VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE COUNSEL SHALL SEND ZOOM CONFERENCE INFORMATION TO JUDGE BEETLESTONE'S CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS POSTPONED TO 6/26/20, AT 11:00 AM. ON OR BEFORE 6/16/20 PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A SUPPLEMENT BRIEF AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/22/20. 5/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants : MOTION HEARING VIA ZOOM CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/26/2020 11:00 AM IN Philadelphia COUNSEL SHALL SEND ZOOM CONFERENCE INFORMATION TO JUDGE BEETLESTONE'S CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov THANK YOU.BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Default Entered (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
April 17, 2020 DEFAULT BY MUSTAFA T. A. ABOTEAT, AHMED ABOUZEID AL MISMARI, FAYEZ AL-SARRAJ, AL-MAHDI HASSAN MUFTAH ALLABAD, IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (amas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID re #23 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants filed by Plaintiffs (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 25 Request for Default Judgment on behalf of ALL Plaintiffs REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Certificate of Service of Request for Entry of Default Judgment)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 24 Request for Default on behalf of all Plaintiffs AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Certificate of Service of Request for Entry of Default)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants filed by BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL VACATE THIS COURT'S ORDER (DOC. NO. #21 ). COUNSEL IS PERMITTED 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE A MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/25/2019. 9/27/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 (VACATED PER ORDER NO. #22 ) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 9/20/2019. 9/24/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) Modified on 9/27/2019 (amas). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Default Entered (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 26, 2019 DEFAULT BY MUSTAFA T. A. ABOTEAT, AHMED ABOUZEID AL MISMARI, FAYEZ AL-SARRAJ, AL-MAHDI HASSAN MUFTAH ALLABAD, IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (nd, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Default by Plaintiffs AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Civil Deputy re: Answer Due (amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 Statement Certification of Counsel Regarding Service of Process by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS re: Jeffrey D. Cochran served Summons and Complaint upon IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI by Personal Service. IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO RE-SERVE DEFENDANT DABBASHI IS GRANTED AND THE TIME LIMIT FOR SERVICE SHALL BE EXTENDED UNTIL 4/19/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/5/2019. 3/6/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Translation)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Translation)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Translation)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Translation)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT, NO LATER THAN 3/4/2019, PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE WITH THIS COURT CERTIFIED TRANSLATIONS OF THE ARABIC DOCUMENTS THAT ARE ATTACHED TO THE WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (DOC. NOS. #3 , #4 , #5 , & #7 ) AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DEEM DEFENDANT DABBASHI IMPROPERLY SERVED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE HIM BY CERTIFIED MAIL RESTRICTED DELIVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 2/15/2019. 2/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Default on behalf of Plaintiffs AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Request for Default)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Civil Deputy re: Answer Due (amw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR. MUSTAFA T. A. ABOTEAT waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Summons and Complaint upon Ibrahim Omar Dabbashi by Certified Mail on 09/28/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR. AL-MAHDI HASSAN MUFTAH ALLABAD waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR. AHMED ABOUZEID AL MISMARI waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by REDA SAAD MOHAMED, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. FAYEZ AL-SARRAJ waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (KRAWITZ, JEFFREY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD SHENSKY on behalf of ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHENSKY, EDWARD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 23, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to MUSTAFA T. A. ABOTEAT, AHMED ABOUZEID AL MISMARI, FAYEZ AL-SARRAJ, AL-MAHDI HASSAN MUFTAH ALLABAD, IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI. 5 Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/24/2018 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MUSTAFA T. A. ABOTEAT, AHMED ABOUZEID AL MISMARI, FAYEZ AL-SARRAJ, AL-MAHDI HASSAN MUFTAH ALLABAD, IBRAHIM OMAR DABBASHI ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 183556.), filed by AHMED ABDELGHANY MOHAMED, GEORGE MAHROUS ADLY MEGALI, AMER ISAMEIL BAKR, AHMED MOHAMMEAD MAHMOUD, REDA SAAD MOHAMED, SAMY SAAD MOHAMED AFIFY, SHERIF TOUAB AZIZ, HESHAM KHALED ELSAYED, EMIL SAMIR BASIT HENIN, YOUSSEF SAAD ESKANDER HANA, WAAL MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, KHALED ATTIA SALEH, ATEF NADI HABIB KAMEL, AID MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, ABDELSALAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD ALSAID, SOBHY HAMDI FATHY GERGES, MOHAMED MOHAMED HOSAIN GANNAB, MAHMOUD FARID ALGAZAR, BOTROS MAKRAM ABDOU ESTEMALEK, REDA SABET GALI AMBAREK, MAKARIOS HAMDI MATA GERGES, SAME ATTIA IBRAHIM, YASSIN MOHAMMAD NASSEF, HAMDY GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, ESMAEEL MOHAMED IBRAHIM MOUSA, SAMI RAMZI NASHED HENIN, TAMER HOSAIN HOSAIN, EMAD MOHAMED ABDALLA ARAFA, MELAD GHALY ATIA GHALY, MOHAMMAD ELSAID IBRAHIM, MAHMOUD RAMADAN ESMAEEL AL SAID, GOMAA EBAID ZEDAN, MOHAMMAD SOBHY MOKHTAR, ABDALLAH ASEM SOLIMAN, ELSAID MOHAMMAD ALKHEIR, ALAA MASOUD ALI MOUSA, MAHMOUD KAMEL MOHAMED NASAR, HAYTHAM KAMEL MOUSTAFA, ESAAK SAMIR FEREZ GAMEL, AHMED MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, SOBHY MOHAMMAD GANAB, EMAD AYAD KAMEL GERGES, MOHAMED DAHY ABDELHAMID AHMED, MOHAMED REDA BEDIR, HANI SAID ABEDELLATI HENDI, YOUNAN GERGES FEKRI YOUNAN, AHMED SALLAH ATTALLAH, ABDELSAMEA ABDELSAMEA NASSIF, WALEAD AHMED HASSAN, ANDRAOUS FAYES DANIEL SHEHATA, MOHAMMAD ALI SHARABIA, GOUDA MOHAMED ABOU ELAMAYEM, IBRAHIM ESKANDER NAZZEM KARAM, ABANOB MAKRAM ASKANDER BOTROS, SALAH HASAN MOHAMED IBRAHIM, ALAA SAID ABEDALLAT HUSAIN, HELMI NAZIM ABDELHALI KARAM, GAMEL IBRAHIM AWAD ASAAD, MELAD GABER RAMZI MAHANI, HANI ROMANI ZEKERY MAGALI, RAMADAN GOMAA ADELLATIF AL SAID, REDA ESAAK MATA GERGES, GERGES SEDIK FAHMI MEGALI, MOHAMMAD IBRAHIM SOLIMAN HAROUN, AMGAD MAKAR ZAKI KAMEL, MOHAMED AHMED HOSAIN, IBRAHIM FARAG AKILA MOFTAH, SHALABY ABDELLATIF HOSSEIN, SALAH HUSSEIN IBRAHIM, ISLAM SOBHI IBRAHIM, ALI SHABAN HOSAIN GANNAB, MOHAMED GABER YOUSEF, AHMED ASHRAF ALI, ESSAM ADEL MOHAMED HASSAN, LOUKA YOUNAN LABIB TOBIA, MOHAMED FATHI ELSAYED, YEHIA SAID MOHAMMAD, MOHAMED MOURSY ABOUARAB, AHMED SHAABAN HUSAIN GANAB, AHMED MOHAMMAD ABDELBASET, MOATAZ AHMED ALSERAG, KHALED MOUSTAFA FOUDA, KARAM SAMAAN IBRAHIM AWAD, KAMAL MOHAMED AL SAID YOUSSEF, FATHI MOHAMED YOUSSEF SELIM, KHALED ALSAID IBRAHIM, MENA MEDHAT KHAMIS MATA, IBRAHIM SHAOUKI IBRAHIM YOUSSEF, ADEL MOSTAFA AHMED AMEEN, SAID ABDELAZEEM HENDI, GERGES RATEB IBRAHIM, MASOUD ATIA MOKHTAR IBRAHIM, HANI ANDRAOUS NASIF HANA, SHAABAN RAMADAN AMAR, WALEED M. ABDELMEGID, MOHAMED TANTAWI SAID ALI, BOSHRA FARID YOUSSEF BERSOUM, ISALM MOHAMED MAHMOUD, YASSER ABDLEALEEM MOHAMMAD, TOUAB NABIL HENIN, NAGY IHAB HASSAN MOHAMED, SALAH LABIB ASHRAF BAHR, HASSAN ADEL ABDELWAHAB MERSAL, NOSEHY GABAIIAH ZEKRY KAMEL, MOHAMED EBRAHIM SAAD, MOATEZ AHMED; FATHY, ABDLRAHMAN MOHAMMED AFIFI, HESHAM MOHAMED MAHMOUD AL SAID, GABER AHMED MOHAMED YOUSSEF, ABDELRAHMAN ELSAYED NASR HASSAN, MOHAMED FOUDA AL ATALLAH, MOUSTAFA AHMED ELKILANY, ADEL AW ADAIIAH ESKANDE IBRAHIM, YOUSSEF GERGES NAEEM SORIAL, MOSAAD ALI AHMED FARAG, MATA YOUNAN MATA GERGES, AHMED GOMMA ATAIA ABOUARAB, NASHAAT BERSOUM YOUSSEF BERSOUM, MOHAMMAD ABDALLAH HAROUN, NADER WAHEEB KHALIL, WAHEED MANKORIOS MICHA MANKORIOS, MOSTAFA ELSAID ALHOSSANY, MELAD SHAUKI RASHED HANA, OSAMA MOHAMED DIAA EL AYOUB, ALAA GOMAA AL SAID, AHMED AL SAID AL SAID IBRAHIM, HANI GABER RAMZI MAHANI, BOULUS SALAH SHAFIK KARAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 9/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bersoumm et al v. Aboteat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Younan Gerges Fekri Younan
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Gaber Ramzi Mahani
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Touab Nabil Henin
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waleed M. Abdelmegid
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Adel Abdelwahab Mersal
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helmi Nazim Abdelhali Karam
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammead Mahmoud
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melad Shauki Rashed Hana
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waheed Mankorios Micha Mankorios
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaled Attia Saleh
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hesham Mohamed Mahmoud Al said
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerges Rateb Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohamed Diaa El Ayoub
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andraous Fayes Daniel Shehata
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melad Ghaly Atia Ghaly
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdlrahman Mohammed Afifi
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Said Abdelazeem Hendi
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdallah Asem Soliman
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobhy Hamdi Fathy Gerges
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashaat Bersoum Youssef Bersoum
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Eskander Nazzem Karam
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boshra Farid Youssef Bersoum
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmaeel Mohamed Ibrahim Mousa
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramadan Gomaa Adellatif Al Said
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osama Mohamed Diaa El Ayoub
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youssef Saad Eskander Hana
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Sallah Attallah
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Fouda Al Atallah
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atef Nadi Habib Kamel
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Mahrous Adly Megali
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelsamea Abdelsamea Nassif
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamel Ibrahim Awad Asaad
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samy Saad Mohamed Afify
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Farid Algazar
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamdy Gomma Ataia Abouarab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reda Esaak Mata Gerges
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaled Moustafa Fouda
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasser Abdlealeem Mohammad
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalaby Abdellatif Hossein
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mosaad Ali Ahmed Farag
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youssef Gerges Naeem Sorial
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Ramadan Esmaeel Al Said
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nader Waheeb Khalil
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Al said Al said Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagy Ihab Hassan Mohamed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Sobhy Mokhtar
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelrahman Elsayed Nasr Hassan
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Same Attia Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Abdelghany Mohamed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherif Touab Aziz
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamer Hosain Hosain
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walead Ahmed Hassan
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaber Ahmed Mohamed Youssef
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Tantawi Said Ali
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mata Younan Mata Gerges
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amer Isameil Bakr
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isalm Mohamed Mahmoud
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaaban Ramadan Amar
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karam Samaan Ibrahim Awad
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khaled Alsaid Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Gaber Yousef
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gouda Mohamed Abou Elamayem
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Mostafa Ahmed Ameen
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melad Gaber Ramzi Mahani
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Fathi Elsayed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masoud Atia Mokhtar Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sobhy Mohammad Ganab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adel Aw Adaiiah Eskande Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Botros Makram Abdou Estemalek
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Ibrahim Soliman Haroun
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Ayad Kamel Gerges
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamal Mohamed Al said Youssef
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boulus Salah Shafik Karas
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Hasan Mohamed Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Shaban Hosain Gannab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mostafa Elsaid Alhossany
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haytham Kamel Moustafa
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louka Younan Labib Tobia
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Shaaban Husain Ganab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aid Mokhtar Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yehia Said Mohammad
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Mohammad Abdelbaset
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Farag Akila Moftah
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moustafa Ahmed Elkilany
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Masoud Ali Mousa
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makarios Hamdi Mata Gerges
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mohamed Hosain Gannab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Ramzi Nashed Henin
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ebrahim Saad
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reda Sabet Gali Ambarek
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsaid Mohammad Alkheir
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Ali Sharabia
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gomaa Ebaid Zedan
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amgad Makar Zaki Kamel
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mena Medhat Khamis Mata
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Said Abedallat Husain
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abanob Makram Askander Botros
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Romani Zekery Magali
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esaak Samir Ferez Gamel
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Labib Ashraf Bahr
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdelsalam Mohamed Mahmoud Alsaid
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hesham Khaled Elsayed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moataz Ahmed Alserag
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Dahy Abdelhamid Ahmed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essam Adel Mohamed Hassan
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Andraous Nasif Hana
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Reda Bedir
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Shaouki Ibrahim Youssef
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Hussein Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Samir Basit Henin
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yassin Mohammad Nassef
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Abdallah Haroun
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reda Saad Mohamed
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islam Sobhi Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Elsaid Ibrahim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Kamel Mohamed Nasar
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moatez Ahmed; Fathy
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emad Mohamed Abdalla Arafa
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Moursy Abouarab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nosehy Gabaiiah Zekry Kamel
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waal Mohamed Mahmoud Al Said
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Said Abedellati Hendi
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Gomma Ataia Abouarab
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Ashraf Ali
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerges Sedik Fahmi Megali
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Gomaa Al Said
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fathi Mohamed Youssef Selim
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ahmed Hosain
Represented By: Edward Shensky
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krawitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ibrahim Omar Dabbashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mustafa T. A. Aboteat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLONEL Ahmed Abouzeid Al Mismari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayez Al-Sarraj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Mahdi Hassan Muftah Allabad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?