Shehadeh v. Horizon Pharma USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elias Shehadeh
Defendant: Horizon Pharma USA, Inc. and ABC Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv08107
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brian Heller dated November 24, 2020 re: Joint Letter in accordance with Initial Pretrial Conference Order. Document filed by Elias Shehadeh..(Heller, Brian)
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie Haar on behalf of Horizon Pharma USA, Inc...(Haar, Jamie)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aaron Warshaw on behalf of Horizon Pharma USA, Inc...(Warshaw, Aaron)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Horizon Pharma USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. Document filed by Elias Shehadeh..(Heller, Brian)
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Horizon Pharma USA, Inc. served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Elias Shehadeh..(Heller, Brian)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (ks)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (kv)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (kv)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Horizon Pharma USA, Inc...(gp)
October 1, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
October 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
October 1, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horizon Pharma USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elias Shehadeh..(Heller, Brian)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heller, Brian)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Pharma USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21918665)Document filed by Elias Shehadeh..(Heller, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shehadeh v. Horizon Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Warshaw
Represented By: Jamie Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Shehadeh
Represented By: Brian Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?