Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation v. Kuhnreich et al
Plaintiff: Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation and Sensio, Inc.
Defendant: Dimitri Paraskevopoulos and Bryna Kuhnreich
Case Number: 1:2020cv08170
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David E. Schwartz and Andrew J. Urgenson dated November 24, 2020 re: Courts Order dated October 6, 2020 (ECF No. 9). Document filed by Sensio, Inc...(Schwartz, David)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for December 1, 2020, is ADJOURNED to December 17, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. By December 10, 2020, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/17/2020) (kv)
November 11, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for December 1, 2020 addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew J. Urgenson dated November 11, 2020. Document filed by Bryna Kuhnreich, Dimitri Paraskevopoulos..(Urgenson, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Rados on behalf of Bryna Kuhnreich, Dimitri Paraskevopoulos..(Rados, Christopher)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Justin Urgenson on behalf of Bryna Kuhnreich, Dimitri Paraskevopoulos..(Urgenson, Andrew)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Sensio, Inc...(Schwartz, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Sensio, Inc...(Schwartz, David)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Bryna Kuhnreich, Dimitri Paraskevopoulos with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sensio, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Schwartz, David)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (jwh)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (kv)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/6/2020) (jwh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dimitri Paraskevopoulos..(dnh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryna Kuhnreich..(dnh)
October 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Eric Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
October 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dimitri Paraskevopoulos, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation..(Schwartz, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bryna Kuhnreich, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation..(Schwartz, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation..(Schwartz, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schwartz, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryna Kuhnreich, Dimitri Paraskevopoulos. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21940007)Document filed by Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation..(Schwartz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation v. Kuhnreich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sensio, Inc., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: David Eric Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sensio, Inc.
Represented By: David Eric Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitri Paraskevopoulos
Represented By: Christopher J. Rados
Represented By: Andrew Justin Urgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryna Kuhnreich
Represented By: Christopher J. Rados
Represented By: Andrew Justin Urgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?