Blue Angel Realty, Inc. v. United States of America et al.
Plaintiff: Blue Angel Realty, Inc.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Unites States Department of Houseing and Urban Development
Case Number: 1:2020cv08220
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on January 6, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/21/2020) (rro)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Of America..(jgo)
October 18, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America and United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blue Angel Realty, Inc...(Fedrizzi, Linda)
October 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Linda F Fedrizzi to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): List the defendants' names on the docket entry;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Linda F Fedrizzi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 08:8715; Dollar Demand $4,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,000,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Linda F Fedrizzi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Unites States Department of Houseing and Urban Development, Blue Angel Realty, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Blue Angel Realty, Inc...(Fedrizzi, Linda) Modified on 10/5/2020 (pc).
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fedrizzi, Linda)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Blue Angel Realty, Inc..(Fedrizzi, Linda)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Unites States Department of Houseing and Urban Development. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21958872)Document filed by Blue Angel Realty, Inc...(Fedrizzi, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Angel Realty, Inc. v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Unites States Department of Houseing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Angel Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Linda F Fedrizzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?