C. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: N.L. C.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv08243
Filed: October 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Joseph Krist on behalf of New York City Department of Education..(Krist, Brian)
November 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. New York City Department of Education waiver sent on 11/13/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Krist, Brian)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Jo Whateley on behalf of N.L. C.(individually)..(Whateley, Mary)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irina Roller on behalf of N.L. C.(individually), N.L. C.(on behalf of her child M.L C, a minor)..(Roller, Irina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by N.L. C.(individually); N.L. C.(on behalf of her child M.L C, a minor)..(Roller, Irina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Roller, Irina)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Irina Roller on behalf of N.L. C.(individually), N.L. C.(on behalf of her child M.L C, a minor)..(Roller, Irina)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Irina Roller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $24,888,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Irina Roller. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Irina Roller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: N.L. C.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Irina Roller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
October 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
October 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
October 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
October 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21969105)Document filed by N.L. C., N.L. C.(individually and on behalf of her child M.L C, a minor)..(Roller, Irina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. et al v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Brian Joseph Krist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.L. C.
Represented By: Irina Roller
Represented By: Mary Whateley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?