Securities and Exchange Commission v. McAfee et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: John McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr. and John David McAfee
Case Number: 1:2020cv08281
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Request for Waiver Mailed on 10/15/2020. Waiver of Service due by 11/16/2020..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr..(pc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John David McAfee..(pc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John O'Donnell Enright on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Enright, John)
October 6, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 6, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 6, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard R. Best. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (pc)
October 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard A Best. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John McAfee. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H. Tutor on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tutor, David)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John David McAfee, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John McAfee, Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Best, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. McAfee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Gale Watson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Richard R. Best
Represented By: Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro
Represented By: David H. Tutor
Represented By: John O'Donnell Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?