Telesco v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia N. Telesco
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv08376
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Referring Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security..(Pantoja, Joseph)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Patricia N. Telesco. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 1/21/2021..(Olinsky, Howard)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security..(dnh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUPPLEMENTING STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ( Represented Parties): The above-referenced social security action has been referred to the undersigned for Report and Recommendation. All motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and all motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, must be made to Judge Lehrburger and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-robert-w-lehrburger. Filing the Record: Pursuant to Standing Order No. 16-MC-00171, dated April 20, 2016, Defendant shall file the electronic certified transcript of the administrative record ("Record"), which shall constitute the Defendant's answer, or move against the complaint, no later than 90 days after Defendant is served with process or otherwise directed by the Court to answer in this action. Thereafter, in order to promote the efficient adjudication of this matter, the parties shall adhere to the following schedule and procedures. And as set forth herein. Counsel for the Plaintiff must serve this Order on the Defendant and must file proof of such service with the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 10/09/2020) (ama)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/9/2020) (mro)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/9/2020) (mro)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc)
October 8, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 8, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Patricia N. Telesco..(Olinsky, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis . Document filed by Patricia N. Telesco..(Olinsky, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Olinsky, Howard)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Patricia N. Telesco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action).(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telesco v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia N. Telesco
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?