Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08446
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc...(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Claudia V. Colon in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint).(Colon Garcia-Moliner, Claudia)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Colon Garcia-Moliner, Claudia)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Claudia V. Colon Garcia-Moliner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (mg)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Claudia V. Colon Garcia-Moliner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22436603. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Colon Garcia-Moliner, Claudia)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Claudia V. Colon Garcia-Moliner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22436603. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Buoscio, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service of Karen Saab-Dominguez).(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Karen Saab-Dominguez in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Terms of Use, #4 Exhibit C-Court Decision: Phillips v. Uber, #5 Exhibit D-TLC License of Iqbal Hussain, #6 Exhibit E-Decision and Order: Minzer v. Barga, et al., #7 Exhibit F-Decision: Fusco v. Uber Tech, #8 Affidavit Certificate of Service for Motion to Dismiss).(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Derek Michael Zisser on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc...(Zisser, Derek)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of WILLIAM A. BREWER, III in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously .. Document filed by Jane Doe..(Brewer, William)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #6 MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously . . Document filed by Jane Doe..(Brewer, William)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously . Document filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order).(Brewer, William)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Andrew Brewer, III on behalf of Jane Doe..(Brewer, William)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karen Saab-Dominguez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Karen Saab-Dominguez. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JANE DOE. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc.. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 158401/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22065816).Document filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service).(Saab-Dominguez, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE DOE
Represented By: Claudia Victoria Colon Garcia-Moliner
Represented By: William Andrew Brewer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Saab-Dominguez
Represented By: Derek Michael Zisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?