Williams-Lawson v. Subway Surface Supervisors Association et al
Plaintiff: Yvette Williams-Lawson
Defendant: Michael Carrube, William Torres and Subway Surface Supervisors Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv08544
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah L Cave
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah L Cave. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/16/2020) (jca)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Defendants Subway Surface Supervisors Association, Michael Carrube, and William Torres and deliver to the U.S. Marshals Service all documents necessary for service. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/16/2020) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
October 15, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
October 15, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/14/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
October 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against William Torres, Michael Carrube, Subway Surface Supervisors Association. Document filed by Yvette Williams-Lawson. (sac) Modified on 10/15/2020 (sac).
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Yvette Williams-Lawson. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams-Lawson v. Subway Surface Supervisors Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Williams-Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carrube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Surface Supervisors Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?