Conrad et al v. Yahoo! et al
Plaintiff: Vicki Conrad and John Dlugolecki
Defendant: Yahoo!, Verizon Communications Inc. and Oath Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv08638
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and Oath that: Oath be substituted in place of Verizon Communications Inc. in this action; the caption of this action will hereafter reflect that party substitution; and Verizon Communications Inc. and Yahoo! Inc. shall be dismissed without prejudice. Oath Inc. added. Verizon Communications Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 12/4/2020) (mro)
December 4, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer L. Bloom dated December 4, 2020 re: Stipulation of Substitution. Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Yahoo!..(Bloom, Jennifer)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Yahoo!..(Bloom, Jennifer)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' application for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 13, is granted. The deadline for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to December 24, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Kenneth P. Norwick dated November 17, 2020 re: #13 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc. and Yahoo! respectfully request a 30-day extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint t . Document filed by Vicki Conrad, John Dlugolecki..(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc. and Yahoo! respectfully request a 30-day extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to until December 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer L. Bloom dated November 17, 2020. Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc., Yahoo!..(Bloom, Jennifer)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Verizon Communications, Inc. respectfully requests a 30-day extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until December 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jennifer L. Bloom dated November 17, 2020. Document filed by Verizon Communications Inc...(Bloom, Jennifer)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Verizon Communications Inc. served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by Vicki Conrad; John Dlugolecki..(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Yahoo! served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by John Dlugolecki..(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of service of documents. Document filed by Vicki Conrad, John Dlugolecki..(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation should take place at least two weeks prior to the Initial Pretrial Conference, which is currently scheduled for February 4, 2021 at 3 p.m. by separate Order to be entered today. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2020) (mro)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2020) (mro)
October 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge John P. Cronan is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications Inc., Yahoo!. (sj)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yahoo! and Verizon Communications, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Vicki Conrad, John Dlugolecki..(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 10/20/2020) (kv)
October 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kenneth P. Norwick. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
October 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Kenneth P. Norwick to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 121 Copyright form is not correct; the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; the Date Filed field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 121 Copyright PDF form Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies.. (jgo)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Norwick, Kenneth) Modified on 10/19/2020 (jgo).
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon Communications Inc., Yahoo!. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22174671)Document filed by Vicki Conrad, John Dlugolecki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H).(Norwick, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conrad et al v. Yahoo! et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Conrad
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dlugolecki
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oath Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?