Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York et al v. New York City Department Of Education, et al
Plaintiff: Xuhui Ni, Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, Lucas Liu, George Lee and Phillip Yan Hing Wong
Defendant: John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 8, City of New York, John Doe No. 5, Chancellor Richard A. Carranza, Police Officer John Doe No. 4, Mayor Bill De Blasio, Jason Marino, New York City Department Of Education,, John Doe No. 2, Police Officer John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 7 and John Doe No. 3
Case Number: 1:2020cv08964
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time or to Strike Defendant City's Submission. On October 29, 2020, the Court directed the parties to show cause, on or before November 11, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed insofar as it is brought against the New York City Department of Education, which appears not to be a suable entity distinct from the City of New York and that the relevant proper non-City entity, if any, is The Board of Education of the City of New York or any successor thereto. The order further provided that any responsive papers and, thereafter, reply papers were to be filed on or before November 18 and 25, respectively. Plaintiff responded to the order to show cause on November 11. The defendants did not. Rather, they sought an extension until November 25, 2020 to respond to plaintiffs submission. On November 25, 2020, the City - but no other defendants - filed what purported to be a Reply to plaintiffs opposition brief to the Court's order to show cause. But it was not a response to plaintiffs opposition brief or to the order to show cause. Rather, it argues that the tenth cause of action, insofar as it "pertain[ s] to the care, maintenance and safekeeping of the New York City Department of Education premises and to the alleged negligence/conduct of the employees of the New York City Department of Education." As plaintiffs motion to strike (Dkt 22) points out, this document is unresponsive to both the order to show cause and plaintiffs opposition except that it parenthetically admits that the Board of Education of the City of New York (the "Board") continues to exist and implies - by the repeated circumlocution "Department/Board" to refer to either or both of the Board and the so-called Department of Education - that the so-called Department and the Board are one and the same. Accordingly, plaintiffs motion to strike the City's memorandum, the latter of which is Dkt 21, is granted. Dkt 21 is stricken without prejudice to a proper motion to dismiss the tenth cause of action in whole or in part. Moreover, inasmuch as the defendants have not responded at all to the order to show cause, the Court takes that motion under submission. No further filings on that issue will be considered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/30/2020) (jca)
November 30, 2020 Filing 22 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time or to Strike Defendant City's Submission addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Laura Dawn Barbieri dated November 30, 2020. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #23 Order. (jca) BRIEF and Memorandum of Law in Response to the Order to Show Cause Dated October 29, 2020. Document filed by City of New York..(Ridgeway, Thais) Modified on 11/30/2020 (jca). Modified on 11/30/2020 (jca).
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thais R. Ridgeway on behalf of Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill De Blasio, New York City Department Of Education,..(Ridgeway, Thais)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Requested time extensions granted. SO ORDERED. Richard A. Carranza answer due 1/19/2021; City of New York answer due 1/19/2021; Bill De Blasio answer due 1/19/2021; Jason Marino answer due 1/19/2021; New York City Department Of Education, answer due 1/19/2021; (Replies due by 11/25/2020.). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/18/2020) (jca)
November 17, 2020 Filing 18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephanie De Angelis dated 11/17/2020., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to plaintiffs Opposition Brief to the Courts Order to Show Cause addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephanie De Angelis dated 11/17/2020. Document filed by Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill De Blasio, New York City Department Of Education,..(De Angelis, Stephanie)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie De Angelis on behalf of City of New York..(De Angelis, Stephanie)
November 11, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION BRIEF to ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
November 11, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Jason Marino served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; New York City Department Of Education, served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Richard A. Carranza served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; City of New York served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Bill De Blasio served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. Service was accepted by Law Department Email Box ServiceECF@law.nyc.gov. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York., SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Jason Marino served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; New York City Department Of Education, served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Richard A. Carranza served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; City of New York served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Bill De Blasio served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. Service was accepted by Law Department Email Box ServiceECF@law.nyc.gov. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York. (Attachments: #1 Law Dept. Proof of Service Receipt and Memo Regarding Service of Process).(Barbieri, Laura)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs shall show cause, on or before November 11, 2020, why this action should not be dismissed insofar as it is brought against the New York City Department of Education, which appears not to be a suable entity distinct from the City of New York and, and that the relevant proper non-City entity, if any, is The Board of Education of the City of New York or any successor thereto. See, e.g., Ximenes v. George Wingate High School, 516 F.3d 156, 159-60 (2d Cir. 2008); Jenkins v. City of New York, 478 F.3d 76, 93 n.19 (2d Cir. 2007); Perez ex rel. Torres v. City of New York, 41 A.D.3d 378,837 N.Y.S.2d 571 (1st Dept. 2007); Nacipucha v. City of New York, 18 M.3d 846, 849 N.Y.S.2d 414 (Sup. Ct. Bronx Co. 2008); N.Y.C. CHARTER Ch. 17 396 ("All actions and proceedings for the recovery of penalties for the violation of any law shall be brought in the name of the City of New York and not in that of any agency, except where otherwise provided by law"). Any responsive papers shall be filed on or before November 18, 2020. Reply papers, if any, shall be served on or before November 25, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/29/2020) (jca)
October 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2020. (jca)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from T. Komatsu, dated 10/28/20 re: I am an Asian-American U.S. Navy veteran, and I am filing this letter to you to request to be granted intervention as of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 24(a)(2) or permissive intervention pursuant to FRCP Rule 24(b) in order to intervene in the case referenced above as an interested party etc. (sc)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard A. Carranza..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Marino..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bill De Blasio..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
October 28, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
October 28, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Marino, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bill De Blasio, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard A. Carranza, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City of New York, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, George Lee, Lucas Liu, Xuhui Ni, Phillip Yan Hing Wong..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Barbieri, Laura)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard A. Carranza, City of New York, Bill De Blasio, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, Jason Marino, New York City Department Of Education,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22327762)Document filed by Xuhui Ni, Siu-Lin Linda Lam, Phillip Yan Hing Wong, Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York, Lucas Liu, George Lee..(Barbieri, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York et al v. New York City Department Of Education, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Represented By: Stephanie De Angelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard A. Carranza
Represented By: Stephanie De Angelis
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe No. 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor Bill De Blasio
Represented By: Stephanie De Angelis
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department Of Education,
Represented By: Stephanie De Angelis
Represented By: Thais R. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer John Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuhui Ni
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chinese American Citizens Alliance Greater New York
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siu-Lin Linda Lam
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Liu
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Yan Hing Wong
Represented By: Laura Dawn Barbieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?