Peterson v. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Peterson
Defendant: Charles Ortiz, PARKCHESTER DPS LLC Parkchester Department of Public Safety d/b/a Parkchester DPS LLC and Parkchester Department of Public Safety LLC doing business as Parkchester DPS LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09090
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants that the above-captioned action he, and the same hereby is, dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and without an award of attorneys' fees, costs, or disbursements to any party. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under with prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/3/2020) (mro)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Charles Ortiz, Parkchester Department of Public Safety LLC..(Rothschild, Howard)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Disclosure, ECF Rules and Instructions, Judge Woods's Individual Rules and Practices, and Magistrate Judge Netburn's Individual Rules and Practices served on Jeffrey Peterson on October 29, 2020, and November 2, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Charles Ortiz, Parkchester Department of Public Safety LLC..(Schwartz, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2020) (mro)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, on October 29, 2020. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than November 12, 2020. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendants is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 10/30/2020) (mro)
October 30, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
October 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
October 30, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
October 30, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Howard Rothschild. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PARKCHESTER DPS LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by PARKCHESTER DPS LLC..(Rothschild, Howard)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rothschild, Howard)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 31331/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22371347).Document filed by PARKCHESTER DPS LLC, Charles Ortiz..(Rothschild, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ortiz
Represented By: Howard Rothschild
Represented By: Howard Ira Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKCHESTER DPS LLC Parkchester Department of Public Safety d/b/a Parkchester DPS LLC
Represented By: Howard Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkchester Department of Public Safety LLC doing business as Parkchester DPS LLC
Represented By: Howard Ira Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?