Perez v. Experian et al
Plaintiff: Eric Andrew Perez
Defendant: Trans Union, Sequium Asset Solutions, Equifax, Federal Trade Commission, Verizon, Citibank and Experian
Case Number: 1:2020cv09119
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER (E-MAIL) from Eric Perez dated 2/21/21 re: I would like to submit for the record the deliberate intimidation, interference, and obstruction. Since the inception of the above case and prior I have been subjected to several orchestrated federal crimes and coordinated attacks through the coordination of a group of individuals under the control of my ex landlord Eduard Haxari which include groups of retards, informants, retired law enforcement, and groups identifying themselves with Luciferian, Scientology, and homosexual sects of religions; as further set forth herein. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (mro)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCANNED DOCUMENTS FROM PRO SE PLAINTIFF. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (mro)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER (E-MAIL) from Eric Perez dated 2/11/21 re: Please add this to my case; Fwd email to Temporary Pro Se Filing: Attached you will find letters from CT Corporation in reference to their function of Experian and Verizon. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (mro)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER (E-MAIL) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Eric Perez dated 2/11/21 re: Please add this to my case. I have received no response from the temporary filing email address and unable to add documents to my pacer account. Fwd Email from Eric Perez to Temporary Pro Se Filings: I received correspondence from CT corporation dated 1-27-21 in reference to service of the complaint. CT Corporation serves as the registered agent to Experian, Citibank, and Verizon. On 1-15-21 three copies of the complaint were served upon CT Corp at their registered address first class express mail return receipt with a letter stating that they served as the registered agents to these corporations; as further set forth herein. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (mro) Modified on 2/12/2021 (mro).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER to #2 Complaint. Document filed by Sequium Asset Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shaun Ertischek).(Little, Brendan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sequium Asset Solutions..(Little, Brendan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to #2 Complaint. Document filed by Sequium Asset Solutions..(Little, Brendan)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #2 Complaint. Document filed by Trans Union..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union. Document filed by Trans Union..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union..(Nicodemus, Camille)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy from Eric Perez dated 1/28/2021 re: I would like to understand where I should report my old passport being stolen and interference of my section 8 HAP contract and new lease to? I never seem to receive any response to any of my complaints. I do not want to sue I believe that my landlord and the real estate manager Mi CASA Realty are involved with communists and groups against the United States and are delaying my process due to malicious means and to receive more rent from HPD. (jca)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's request to extend the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint from February 5, 2021, to March 22, 2021, is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Equifax answer due 3/22/2021. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/27/2021) (mml)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Courtney Stieber dated January 27, 2021. Document filed by Equifax..(Stieber, Courtney)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED(Proof of Service). Summons and Complaint served. Citibank, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; Equifax, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; Experian, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; Sequium Asset Solutions, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; Trans Union, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021; Verizon, served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021. Service was made by Cert. Mail to Registered Agent Solutions for Sequium Asset Solutions; The Prentice-Hall Corporation System, Inc. for Equifax and Transunion; CT Corporation System for Citibank, Verizon Wireless, and Experian. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Eric Andrew Perez 421 8th Ave. Unit # 93 New York, NY 10116, on 01/06/2021 Re: #11 Order of Service Add and Terminate Parties,, via MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 6 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (ta)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citibank, Equifax, Experian, Sequium Asset Solutions, Trans Union, Verizon. (ta)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants Citibank, Equifax, Experian, Sequium Asset Solutions, Trans Union, and Verizon. The Court dismisses all claims brought under the Federal Trade Commission Act and all claims brought against the Federal Trade Commission. Federal Trade Commission terminated. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 1/6/2021) (mro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trans Union, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sequium Asset Solutions, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Experian, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Trade Commission, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Equifax, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER from Eric Perez, dated 12/26/20 re: I filed this complaint electronically with all the necessary forms and in the legal format, please see attached exhibits. I have not received any electronic or physical notifications about the above entitled complaint due to a Court employee changing the vital email address of experttrainers@icloud.com to experttrainero@iword.com. This was perpetrated as a way to create a delay in this case and as a way to make fun of the plaintiff etc. I require the Judge's order and the necessary paperwork needed for proper service of the lawsuit to the defendants in this lawsuit sent to the address listed on the documents and listed above. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez.(sc)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER from Eric Perez dated 12/26/20 re: I am filing this complaint in reference to the filing of the entitled complaint on 10/20/20. I filed the complaint electronically with all the necessary forms and in the legal format, please see attached exhibits. I have not received any electronic or physical notifications about the above entitled complaint due to a Court employee changing the valid email addres of experttrainers@icloud.com to experttrainero@iword.com. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez.(sc)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of Docket Sheet to Eric Andrew Perez 421 8th Ave. Unit # 93 New York, NY 10116.(ta)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Eric Perez, dated 12/30/20 re: I am writing this notice to advise the Court that I have not received any notifications of any type from the Court in reference to the above entitled case etc. I have not received any electronic or mail notifications. I believe that my case is being deliberately obstructed through various electronic means, because I have not received any notifications from the system. I am requesting that all notifications in this case be sent electronically; and that I be assigned counsel for this case. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(sc)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PRO BONO COUNSEL terminating #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing; denying #4 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs Application for the Court to Request Counsel is denied. The Court instructs the Clerk to terminate ECF No. 4. The Court further instructs the clerk to terminate ECF No. 3, Plaintiff's application to receive electronic case notifications, as the docket reflects that Plaintiff has consented to receiving electronic service. (Doc. 5). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 12/16/2020) (mml)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $400.00 Check processed by the Finance Department on 11/6/2020, Receipt Number 465401269453. (sw)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/7/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/5/2020) (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP application) (asg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Eric A. Perez consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(rdz)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(rdz)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Eric Andre Perez to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(rdz)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Citibank, Equifax, Experian, Federal Trade Commission, Sequium Asset Solutions, Trans Union, Verizon. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(rdz)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Eric Andrew Perez..(rdz)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Experian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequium Asset Solutions
Represented By: Brendan Hoffman Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Courtney Sophie Stieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Andrew Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?