Broumand v. Joseph et al
Plaintiff: Stafford Broumand and Stafford Broumand, M.D.
Defendant: Sean Gabriel, Patricia Hawkins, Jeremy Joseph, Leigh Slaughter and Jennifer A Greenhall
Interested Party: VentureForth Holdings, LLC, Apelles VentureForth SPV, LLC, Columbia Care, LLC, Michael Abbott and Nicholas Vita
Case Number: 1:2020cv09137
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:7
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Emily Kirsch in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B).(Kirsch, Emily)
December 23, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Emily Kirsch in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
December 23, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
December 18, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #29 MOTION for Steven A. Heath to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Jeremy Joseph. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23105398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/B The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
December 18, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Steven A. Heath to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Jeremy Joseph. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23105398. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeremy Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven A. Heath, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (New York), #3 Certificate of Good Standing (California), #4 Proposed Order).(Sher, Justin)
December 18, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Sean Gabriel..(Gaffney, Patrick)
December 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Sean Gabriel. Responses due by 12/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Gaffney, Patrick)
December 11, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2020.Present were a court reporter, for the plaintiff/petitioner, Emily Kirsch & Lisa Frye, for the defendant/respondent Jeremy Joseph - Heather Yu Han and Stephen Heath, for Sean Gabriel - Patrick Gaffney, for Interested Party Michael Abbott - Anthony Paduano.Court's decision: Defendant/respondant's Motion to Dismiss for lack of Jurisdiction due 12/18/2020, Plaintiff/petitioner's response due 12/23/2020, the Court will set argument, if necessary, after 12/23/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Joseph Snyder on behalf of Michael Abbott, Apelles VentureForth SPV, LLC, Columbia Care, LLC, VentureForth Holdings, LLC, Nicholas Vita..(Snyder, Jason)
December 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari J. Silverman on behalf of Michael Abbott, Apelles VentureForth SPV, LLC, Columbia Care, LLC, VentureForth Holdings, LLC, Nicholas Vita..(Silverman, Ari)
December 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Paduano on behalf of Michael Abbott, Nicholas Vita, Columbia Care, LLC, Apelles VentureForth SPV, LLC, VentureForth Holdings, LLC..(Paduano, Anthony)
December 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Gaffney on behalf of Sean Gabriel..(Gaffney, Patrick)
December 7, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE re: #1 Petition (Other), . Document filed by Jeremy Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven A. Heath, #2 Exhibit A to Heath Decl. (2018.11.30 State Court Complaint), #3 Exhibit B to Heath Decl. (2020.08.06 Letter to E Kirsch), #4 Exhibit C to Heath Decl. (2020.08.06 Letter to E Kirsch), #5 Exhibit D to Heath Decl. (2020.08.12 Email from L Frey), #6 Exhibit E to Heath Decl. (2020.08.14 Letter to E Kirsch), #7 Exhibit F to Heath Decl. (2020.12.03 Email re fact discovery close), #8 Exhibit G to Heath Decl. (2019.04.01 Abbott deposition excerpts), #9 Declaration of Jeremy Joseph).(Sher, Justin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yu Han on behalf of Jeremy Joseph..(Han, Yu)
December 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin M. Sher on behalf of Jeremy Joseph..(Sher, Justin)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE at 11:45 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/2/2020) (jwh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition served on Sean Gabriel on 11/10/2020. Service was accepted by Reilly Gordon. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 4, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeremy Joseph..(pc)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer A Greenhall..(pc)
November 4, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patricia Hawkins..(pc)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leigh Slaughter..(pc)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sean Gabriel..(pc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leigh Slaughter, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeremy Joseph, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patricia Hawkins, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer A. Greenhall, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Gabriel, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand, M.D...(Kirsch, Emily)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Emily Bab Kirsch to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 2, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Emily Bab Kirsch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 9:0001. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 09:7 Petition to compel attendance before arbitrator. (dnh)
November 2, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Emily Bab Kirsch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Stafford Broumand. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirsch, Emily)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leigh Slaughter, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand..(Kirsch, Emily) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dnh).
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeremy Joseph, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand..(Kirsch, Emily) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dnh).
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patricia Hawkins, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand..(Kirsch, Emily) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dnh).
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer A. Greenhall, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand..(Kirsch, Emily) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dnh).
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sean Gabriel, re: #1 Petition (Other),. Document filed by Stafford Broumand..(Kirsch, Emily) Modified on 11/2/2020 (dnh).
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR'S SUBPOENAS. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22395169).Document filed by Stafford Broumand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit subpoena, #2 Exhibit subpoena, #3 Exhibit subpoena, #4 Exhibit subpoena, #5 Exhibit subpoena).(Kirsch, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broumand v. Joseph et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Gabriel
Represented By: Patrick Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Joseph
Represented By: Justin M. Sher
Represented By: Yu Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer A Greenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stafford Broumand
Represented By: Emily Bab Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stafford Broumand, M.D.
Represented By: Emily Bab Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VentureForth Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jason Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Ari J. Silverman
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Apelles VentureForth SPV, LLC
Represented By: Jason Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Ari J. Silverman
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Columbia Care, LLC
Represented By: Jason Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Ari J. Silverman
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Abbott
Represented By: Jason Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Ari J. Silverman
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nicholas Vita
Represented By: Jason Joseph Snyder
Represented By: Ari J. Silverman
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?