Kiewit Power Constructors Co. v. Talbot Underwriting Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Kiewit Power Constructors Co.
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co., Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Axis Managing Agency Ltd., Starr Managing Agents Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ, Beazley Furlonge Limited, Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, HDI Global Insurance Company, Starstone Insurance SE, Arch Managing Agency Limited, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, Travelers Syndicate Management Limited, Liberty Managing Agency Limited, Swiss RE International Se, UK Branch and QBE Underwriting Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv09164
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 62 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co...(jgo)
December 23, 2020 Filing 61 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Co...(jgo)
December 22, 2020 Filing 60 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co., re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
December 22, 2020 Filing 59 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Preisendanz Argyle to RE-FILE Document No. #39 Request for Issuance of Summons, #42 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name listed on the summons PDF in the 'To:' section must appear exactly as it does in the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 58 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HDI Global Insurance Company..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 57 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Swiss RE International Se, UK Branch..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 55 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Starstone Insurance SE..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 54 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Argo Managing Agency Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Starr Managing Agents Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Managing Agency Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liberty Managing Agency Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to QBE Underwriting Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Beazley Furlonge Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canopius Managing Agents Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Axis Managing Agency Ltd...(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelers Syndicate Management Limited..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Talbot Underwriting Ltd..(dnh)
November 6, 2020 Filing 42 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/9/2020 (dnh).
November 6, 2020 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HDI Global Insurance Company, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co., re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/9/2020 (dnh).
November 6, 2020 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Swiss Re International SE, UK Branch, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starstone Insurance SE, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Argo Managing Agency Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Managing Agents Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arch Managing Agency Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Managing Agency Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to QBE Underwriting Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beazley Furlonge Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Canopius Managing Agents Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Axis Managing Agency Ltd., re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelers Syndicate Management Limited, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Talbot Underwriting Ltd, re: #22 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 5, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/5/2020) (mro)
November 5, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Preisendanz Argyle to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #19 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #21 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #20 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons must be linked to an accepted pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
November 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
November 5, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
November 5, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
November 5, 2020 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #22 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-22416341, paid on 11/2/2020. (sj)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kiewit Energy Group Inc. for Kiewit Power Constructors Co.. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 COMPLAINT against Arch Managing Agency Limited, Argo Managing Agency Limited, Axis Managing Agency Ltd., Beazley Furlonge Limited, Canopius Managing Agents Limited, Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ, HDI Global Insurance Company, Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, Liberty Managing Agency Limited, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., QBE Underwriting Limited, Starr Managing Agents Limited, Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co., Starstone Insurance SE, Swiss RE International Se, UK Branch, Talbot Underwriting Ltd, Travelers Syndicate Management Limited. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy).(Argyle, Benjamin)
November 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Benjamin Preisendanz Argyle to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 11/9/2020. (sj)
November 4, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [1 and 3] Complaint. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filing court listed as United States Supreme Court. (sj)
November 2, 2020 Filing 21 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Managing Agency Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/4/2020 (sj). Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 20 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HDI Global Insurance Company, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 19 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 18 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Swiss Re International SE, UK Branch, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starstone Insurance SE, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Argo Managing Agency Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Managing Agents Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arch Managing Agency Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to QBE Underwriting Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Beazley Furlonge Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Canopius Managing Agents Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AXIS Managing Agency Ltd., re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co...(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelers Syndicate Management Limited, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Talbot Underwriting Ltd, re: 3 Complaint. Document filed by Kiewit Power Constructors Co..(Argyle, Benjamin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (sj).
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Argyle, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiewit Power Constructors Co. v. Talbot Underwriting Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Surplus Lines Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canopius Managing Agents Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Managing Agency Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Managing Agents Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argo Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Co. of AZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Furlonge Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy (Underwriting Agencies) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starstone Insurance SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talbot Underwriting Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catlin Underwriting Agencies Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Syndicate Management Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Managing Agency Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss RE International Se, UK Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Underwriting Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiewit Power Constructors Co.
Represented By: Benjamin Preisendanz Argyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?