Renois v. WVMF Funding, LLC et al
Plaintiff: marianne renois
Defendant: compu-link corporation d/b/a celink, wvmf funding, LLC and Compu-Link Corporation doing business as Celink
Case Number: 1:2020cv09281
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lee Gray on behalf of WVMF Funding, LLC..(Gray, Jennifer)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Lee Gray on behalf of Compu-Link Corporation..(Gray, Jennifer)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: The Court will hold a telephonic initial pretrial conference in the above-captioned case on January 12, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to call the following Toll-Free Number: 877-411-9748 and use Access Code: 9612281. The parties are directed to file, no later than January 5, 2021, a jointly proposed discovery plan, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and as further set forth in this Scheduling Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Telephone Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 12/1/2020) Copies to: All counsel (via ECF). (rjm)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants may have until 1/6/2021 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman)(Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. Motions referred to Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/24/2020) (ama)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by WVMF Funding, LLC..(Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Peer Advisors, LLC for Compu-Link Corporation. Document filed by Compu-Link Corporation..(Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Fernando C. Rivera-Maissonet dated November 23, 2020. Document filed by Compu-Link Corporation, WVMF Funding, LLC..(Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet on behalf of Compu-Link Corporation, WVMF Funding, LLC..(Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oren Giskan on behalf of Marianne Renois..(Giskan, Oren)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Elizabeth Anderson on behalf of Marianne Renois..(Anderson, Catherine)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Elizabeth Anderson on behalf of Marianne Renois..(Anderson, Catherine)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Compu-Link Corporation served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Service was accepted by M. Carkner, Registered Agent Front Desk. Document filed by Marianne Renois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Tusa, Joseph)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. WVMF Funding, LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Service was accepted by M. Carkner, Registered Agent Front Desk. Document filed by Marianne Renois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Tusa, Joseph)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compu-Link Corporation. (sj)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WVMF Funding, LLC. (sj)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Compu-Link Corporation, WVMF Funding, LLC. Document filed by Marianne Renois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Tusa, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Seth Tusa to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Seth Tusa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: marianne renois, compu-link corporation d/b/a celink. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Compu-Link Corporation d/b/a Celink, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by marianne renois..(Tusa, Joseph)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WVMF Funding, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by marianne renois..(Tusa, Joseph)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tusa, Joseph)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against marianne renois. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22451598)Document filed by marianne renois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Tusa, Joseph) Modified on 11/6/2020 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renois v. WVMF Funding, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: compu-link corporation d/b/a celink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wvmf funding, LLC
Represented By: Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compu-Link Corporation doing business as Celink
Represented By: Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: marianne renois
Represented By: Joseph Seth Tusa
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Anderson
Represented By: Oren Giskan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?