Pena et al v. General Motors Company et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Pena and Francisco Fernandez
Defendant: General Motors Company, Mary Barra and General Motors Financial Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09294
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mary Barra, General Motors Financial Company Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Vivian Pena, Francisco Fernandez.(sc)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION AND ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fees or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff Fernandez is also directed to complete, sign, and submit the declaration. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fees due by 1/21/2021. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 1/21/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/22/2020) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 IFP Application) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/22/2020) (dmg). (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/22/2020) (dmg).
December 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Vivian Pena consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Vivian Pena.(sac)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Vivian Pena.(sac)
November 5, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena et al v. General Motors Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Barra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?