Deitsch v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Deitsch
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09322
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Benjamin Deitsch. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Prior Settlement Agreement And Release).(Nicodemus, Camille)
December 24, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/7/2020) (jca)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Benjamin Deitsch. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Barry Turcotte on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(Turcotte, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Granted. (TransUnion, LLC answer due 1/1/2021.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/2/2020) (jwh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Camille R. Nicodemus dated December 1, 2020. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union, Corporate Parent Trans Union Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price for TransUnion, LLC. Document filed by TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC..(Nicodemus, Camille)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. TransUnion, LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TransUnion, LLC..(dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transunion, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)
November 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Rozenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A...(pc)
November 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 9, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 9, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transunion, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark) Modified on 11/9/2020 (pc).
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22468042)Document filed by Benjamin Deitsch..(Rozenberg, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deitsch v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Barry Turcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Camille Renee Nicodemus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Deitsch
Represented By: Mark Rozenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?