Pujol Moreira, et al v. Societe Generale, S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Raul Pujol Meneses, Ana H. Fraga, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Sara L. Pujol and Juan B. Pujol Moreira
Defendant: Societe Generale, S.A. and BNP Paribas, S.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09380
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Cohen on behalf of Societe Generale, S.A...(Cohen, Stephen)
January 6, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle J. Annunziata on behalf of Societe Generale, S.A...(Annunziata, Michelle)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Wolowitz on behalf of Societe Generale, S.A...(Wolowitz, Steven)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER, THE PARTIES STIPULATE AS FOLLOWS: 1. The defendants shall file a single joint motion to dismiss no later than January 27, 2021. The defendants' memorandum of law in support of their motion shall not exceed forty (40) pages; 2. The plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss within thirty (30) days of the defendants' motion to dismiss being filed. The plaintiffs' memorandum of law in opposition to the motion to dismiss shall not exceed forty (40) pages; 3. The defendants shall file a single reply, if any, in further support of their motion to dismiss within twenty-one (21) days of the plaintiffs' opposition. The reply memorandum of law in further support of their motion shall not exceed twenty (20) pages; 4. Pursuant to section 8.5(b) of the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions for the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, the use of conformed electronic signatures is with the consent of all signatories to this filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 16. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and to Enlarge Page Limits as to Motion to Dismiss Briefing addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Steven F. Molo dated December 28, 2020. filed by Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Raul Pujol Meneses, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Sara L. Pujol, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Ana H. Fraga, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Ines Maria Pujol Faget. ( Motions due by 1/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/29/2020) (kv)
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses..(Molo, Steven)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and to Enlarge Page Limits as to Motion to Dismiss Briefing addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Steven F. Molo dated December 28, 2020. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order).(Molo, Steven)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for James A. Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for James A. Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22961891. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for James A. Barta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22961891. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Ex. C - Proposed Order).(Barta, James)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Javier A. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Dwayne Antonio Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Evan Stroman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
December 1, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Javier A. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22830754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Javier A. Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22830754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Lopez, Javier)
December 1, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Evan Stroman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22829915. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for Dwayne Antonio Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22830571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Dwayne Antonio Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22830571. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Proposed Order)).(Robinson, Dwayne)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Evan Stroman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22829915. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Proposed Order)).(Stroman, Evan)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 11, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/30/2020) (ama)
November 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
November 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 30, 2020 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 20cv851 and declined by Judge Kimba Wood and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
November 10, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,.Document filed by Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,..(Molo, Steven)
November 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Francis Molo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sara L. Pujol, Ines Maria Pujol Faget. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Widlanski on behalf of Sara L. Pujol, Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, Raul Pujol Meneses..(Widlanski, Benjamin)
November 10, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Kimba M. Wood as possibly related to 1:20-cv-00851-KMW-KNF. (dnh)
November 10, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 10, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
November 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Francis Molo re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties 'Juan B. Pujol Moreira,' 'Ines Maria Pujol Faget,' and 'Sara L. Pujol' to the docket in their second capacities with corresponding party text (i.e. as Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol) and party alias (when applicable). Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (dnh)
November 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Francis Molo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez ; Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo ; Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Ellen Margolis on behalf of Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Raul Pujol Meneses, Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas..(Margolis, Sara)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-851. Document filed by Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Raul Pujol Meneses, Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas..(Molo, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Molo, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Francis Molo on behalf of Ana H. Fraga, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Luis R. Pujol Rojas, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Raul Pujol Meneses, Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas..(Molo, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas, S.A., Societe Generale, S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22505517)Document filed by Ana H. Fraga, Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo, Lorenzo Perez Pujol, Pilar M. Pujol Meneses, Maria Julia Pujol Moreira, Francisco Pujol Meneses, Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas, Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez, Raul Pujol Meneses, Luis R. Pujol Rojas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Esta Era la Banca de Cuba, #2 Exhibit 2 - Verified Complaint for Forfeiture, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plea Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Gaceta Oficial).(Molo, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pujol Moreira, et al v. Societe Generale, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilar M. Pujol Meneses
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara L. Pujol, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Laureano Pujol Rojas
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Julia Pujol Moreira
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis R. Pujol Rojas
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Pujol Meneses
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Pujol Meneses
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana H. Fraga
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Perez Pujol
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan B. Pujol Moreira, in his personal capacity, and as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ines Maria Pujol Faget, as Personal Representative and Executor of the Estate of Arcadio Joaquin Pujol Izquierdo
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ines Maria Pujol Faget
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan B. Pujol Moreira, as Personal Representative and Administrator of the Estate of Nieves Pujol, a/k/a Nieves Moreira Martinez
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara L. Pujol
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan B. Pujol Moreira
Represented By: Sara Ellen Margolis
Represented By: Steven Francis Molo
Represented By: James A. Barta
Represented By: Dwayne Antonio Robinson
Represented By: Javier A. Lopez
Represented By: Evan Stroman
Represented By: Benjamin Widlanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale, S.A.
Represented By: Michelle J. Annunziata
Represented By: Stephen M. Cohen
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?