Hargrave et al v. Islamic Republic Of Iran
Plaintiff: Carolyn Marie Kelly, Ryan Marchbanks, Chasity DeLeon, Barbara Dunleavy, Dina Retik, Denyse Betcher, Ronald Mazza, Susan Brand, Oscar Salcedo, Alan Retik, Karen E. Maude, Amber Salcedo, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Kayla Salcedo, William Regan, Rose Mazza, Maureen Murphy, Rachel Quinnie, Markos Salcedo, Teresa Maude, Danny J. Morino, Patricia Mansfield, Stephen Nevins, Jessica A. Navas, Lauren Baker, Susan Retik, Kathleen A. Koehler, Stanley Rodgers, Molly Retik, Teresa Marchbanks, Christopher Delosh, Miriam Carter, Joseph Lamb, Sr., Raysa Rodriguez, Troy Kirwin, Ethel Scott, Benjamin Retik, Jessica Darden, Berdie Hicks, Sara Micciulli, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, James Jenkins, Jr., Sharon Henderson, Daniel Lamb, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Joseph M. Navas, Jr., James T. OConnor, Joan Kirwin, Melody Salcedo, Francisco Salcedo, Maria Vega, Melissa Magazine, Maureen Regan, Lorraine B. Foley, Jennifer Bruno, Frank Perry, Jackson S. OConnor, Patrick Perry, Mark Retik, Justin C. Navas, Catherine Perry, Karen Robertson-Jurcziak, Miriam Salcedo, Mary Ann Struble, Matilde Salcedo, John Doe 88, Karen A. Navas, Emily Micciulli, Joel Salcedo, Joanne Los Kamp, Miles Kirwin, James J. Hargrave, Jeanine Murphy, Colleen Micciulli-Foley, Orson Salcedo, John Mazza, Andrea Madonna, Victor Mazza, Kathryn M. Quinn, Elsie Cintron-Rosado, Iris Vega, Belinda Barino Dillard, Virginia Parro, Kenneth Haskell, James T. O'Connor, Jackson S. O'Connor, Regina Madigan and Joan Reilly
Defendant: Islamic Republic Of Iran
Case Number: 1:2020cv09387
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
January 6, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of two copies of the Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint deemed filed on November 10,2020, Summons, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of Suit, Affidavit of Translator (along with translations of the above documents in farsi) mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javad Zarif at the following address: Mohammad Javad Zarif, Ministry of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran on 12/28/2020 by Federal Express tracking # 8163 9475 1882, to the Secretary of State, Attn: Jared Hess, Office of Policy Review and Inter-Agency Liaison (CA/OCS/L), U.S. Department of State, SA-17, 10th Floor, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (JKR)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Statement of Relatedness, Notice of suit, Affidavit of Translator mailed to Minister of Foreign Affairs, Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the Islamic Republic of Iran, Imam Khomeini Avenue, Tehran, Iran, ATTN: H.E. Mohammad Javal Zarif on 11/24/2020 by Registered Mail tracking # RE295893187US, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3)..(Ross, Javonn)
November 12, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Joan Reilly, Regina Madigan added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,.Document filed by Joan Reilly, Regina Madigan. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Islamic Republic Of Iran..(gp)
November 12, 2020 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:03-MD-1570. (gp)
November 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(gp)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jerry Goldman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jackson S. O'Connor and James T. O'Connor. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error. (gp)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jerry Goldman re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents and split Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan. Please add them individually in their Legal Guardian roles and as surviving siblings roles. (gp)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jerry S. Goldman Esq. dated 11/10/2020 Document filed by Lauren Baker, Belinda Barino Dillard, Denyse Betcher, Susan Brand, Jennifer Bruno, Miriam Carter, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(individually, as surviving parent of Maria Ramirez), Elsie Cintron-Rosado(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Maria Ramirez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Maria Ramirez), Jessica Darden, Chasity DeLeon, Christopher Delosh(individually, as surviving spouse of Kathy N. Mazza), Christopher Delosh(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathy N. Mazza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kathy N. Mazza), John Doe 88, Barbara Dunleavy, Lorraine B. Foley, James J. Hargrave, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Haskell), Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Haskell), Sharon Henderson, Berdie Hicks, James Jenkins, Jr, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Joan Kirwin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Kirwin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Glenn Kirwin), Joan Kirwin(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Kirwin), Miles Kirwin, Troy Kirwin, Kathleen A. Koehler, Daniel Lamb, Joseph Lamb, Sr, Joanne Los Kamp, Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Edward Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(individually, as surviving sibling of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Melissa Magazine, Patricia Mansfield, Ryan Marchbanks, Teresa Marchbanks(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Marchbanks, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Teresa Marchbanks(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Carolyn Marie Kelly, Karen E. Maude, Teresa Maude(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Maude, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Maude), Teresa Maude(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Maude), John Mazza, Ronald Mazza, Rose Mazza, Victor Mazza, Emily Micciulli, Sara Micciulli, Colleen Micciulli-Foley(individually, as surviving spouse of William Micciulli ), Colleen Micciulli-Foley(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Micciulli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Micciulli ), Danny J. Morino, Jeanine Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of James Murphy, IV), Jeanine Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Murphy, IV, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Murphy, IV), Maureen Murphy, Jessica A. Navas, Joseph M. Navas, Jr, Justin C. Navas, Karen A. Navas(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph M. Navas), Karen A. Navas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph M. Navas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph M. Navas), Stephen Nevins, Jackson S. OConnor, James T. OConnor, Virginia Parro, Catherine Perry, Patrick Perry, Frank Perry, Kathryn M. Quinn(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy J. Hargrave), Kathryn M. Quinn(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hargrave, deceased, the late parent of Timothy J. Hargrave), Rachel Quinnie, Maureen Regan, William Regan, Alan Retik(individually, as surviving parent of David Retik), Benjamin Retik, Dina Retik, Mark Retik, Molly Retik, Susan Retik(individually, as surviving spouse of David Retik), Susan Retik(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Retik, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Retik), Alan Retik (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynne Retik, deceased, the late parent of David Retik), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Robertson, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(individually, as surviving spouse of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Stanley Rodgers, Raysa Rodriguez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Esmerlin Salcedo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Esmerlin Salcedo), Raysa Rodriguez(individually, as surviving sibling of Esmerlin Salcedo), Amber Salcedo, Francisco Salcedo, Joel Salcedo, Kayla Salcedo, Markos Salcedo, Matilde Salcedo, Melody Salcedo, Miriam Salcedo, Orson Salcedo, Oscar Salcedo, Ethel Scott, Mary Ann Struble, Iris Vega, Maria Vega..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Elliot Strong on behalf of Lauren Baker, Belinda Barino Dillard, Denyse Betcher, Susan Brand, Jennifer Bruno, Miriam Carter, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(individually, as surviving parent of Maria Ramirez), Elsie Cintron-Rosado(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Maria Ramirez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Maria Ramirez), Jessica Darden, Chasity DeLeon, Christopher Delosh(individually, as surviving spouse of Kathy N. Mazza), Christopher Delosh(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathy N. Mazza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kathy N. Mazza), John Doe 88, Barbara Dunleavy, Lorraine B. Foley, James J. Hargrave, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Haskell), Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Haskell), Sharon Henderson, Berdie Hicks, James Jenkins, Jr, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Joan Kirwin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Kirwin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Glenn Kirwin), Joan Kirwin(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Kirwin), Miles Kirwin, Troy Kirwin, Kathleen A. Koehler, Daniel Lamb, Joseph Lamb, Sr, Joanne Los Kamp, Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Edward Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(individually, as surviving sibling of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Melissa Magazine, Patricia Mansfield, Ryan Marchbanks, Teresa Marchbanks(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Marchbanks, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Teresa Marchbanks(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Carolyn Marie Kelly, Karen E. Maude, Teresa Maude(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Maude, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Maude), Teresa Maude(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Maude), John Mazza, Ronald Mazza, Rose Mazza, Victor Mazza, Emily Micciulli, Sara Micciulli, Colleen Micciulli-Foley(individually, as surviving spouse of William Micciulli ), Colleen Micciulli-Foley(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Micciulli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Micciulli ), Danny J. Morino, Jeanine Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of James Murphy, IV), Jeanine Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Murphy, IV, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Murphy, IV), Maureen Murphy, Jessica A. Navas, Joseph M. Navas, Jr, Justin C. Navas, Karen A. Navas(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph M. Navas), Karen A. Navas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph M. Navas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph M. Navas), Stephen Nevins, Jackson S. OConnor, James T. OConnor, Virginia Parro, Catherine Perry, Patrick Perry, Frank Perry, Kathryn M. Quinn(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy J. Hargrave), Kathryn M. Quinn(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hargrave, deceased, the late parent of Timothy J. Hargrave), Rachel Quinnie, Maureen Regan, William Regan, Alan Retik(individually, as surviving parent of David Retik), Benjamin Retik, Dina Retik, Mark Retik, Molly Retik, Susan Retik(individually, as surviving spouse of David Retik), Susan Retik(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Retik, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Retik), Alan Retik (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynne Retik, deceased, the late parent of David Retik), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Robertson, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(individually, as surviving spouse of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Stanley Rodgers, Raysa Rodriguez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Esmerlin Salcedo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Esmerlin Salcedo), Raysa Rodriguez(individually, as surviving sibling of Esmerlin Salcedo), Amber Salcedo, Francisco Salcedo, Joel Salcedo, Kayla Salcedo, Markos Salcedo, Matilde Salcedo, Melody Salcedo, Miriam Salcedo, Orson Salcedo, Oscar Salcedo, Ethel Scott, Mary Ann Struble, Iris Vega, Maria Vega..(Strong, Bruce)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-MD-1570. Document filed by Lauren Baker, Belinda Barino Dillard, Denyse Betcher, Susan Brand, Jennifer Bruno, Miriam Carter, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(individually, as surviving parent of Maria Ramirez), Elsie Cintron-Rosado(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Maria Ramirez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Maria Ramirez), Jessica Darden, Chasity DeLeon, Christopher Delosh(individually, as surviving spouse of Kathy N. Mazza), Christopher Delosh(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathy N. Mazza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kathy N. Mazza), John Doe 88, Barbara Dunleavy, Lorraine B. Foley, James J. Hargrave, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Haskell), Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Haskell), Sharon Henderson, Berdie Hicks, James Jenkins, Jr, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Joan Kirwin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Kirwin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Glenn Kirwin), Joan Kirwin(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Kirwin), Miles Kirwin, Troy Kirwin, Kathleen A. Koehler, Daniel Lamb, Joseph Lamb, Sr, Joanne Los Kamp, Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Edward Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(individually, as surviving sibling of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Melissa Magazine, Patricia Mansfield, Ryan Marchbanks, Teresa Marchbanks(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Marchbanks, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Teresa Marchbanks(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Carolyn Marie Kelly, Karen E. Maude, Teresa Maude(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Maude, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Maude), Teresa Maude(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Maude), John Mazza, Ronald Mazza, Rose Mazza, Victor Mazza, Emily Micciulli, Sara Micciulli, Colleen Micciulli-Foley(individually, as surviving spouse of William Micciulli ), Colleen Micciulli-Foley(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Micciulli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Micciulli ), Danny J. Morino, Jeanine Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of James Murphy, IV), Jeanine Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Murphy, IV, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Murphy, IV), Maureen Murphy, Jessica A. Navas, Joseph M. Navas, Jr, Justin C. Navas, Karen A. Navas(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph M. Navas), Karen A. Navas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph M. Navas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph M. Navas), Stephen Nevins, Jackson S. OConnor, James T. OConnor, Virginia Parro, Catherine Perry, Patrick Perry, Frank Perry, Kathryn M. Quinn(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy J. Hargrave), Kathryn M. Quinn(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hargrave, deceased, the late parent of Timothy J. Hargrave), Rachel Quinnie, Maureen Regan, William Regan, Alan Retik(individually, as surviving parent of David Retik), Benjamin Retik, Dina Retik, Mark Retik, Molly Retik, Susan Retik(individually, as surviving spouse of David Retik), Susan Retik(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Retik, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Retik), Alan Retik (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynne Retik, deceased, the late parent of David Retik), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Robertson, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(individually, as surviving spouse of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Stanley Rodgers, Raysa Rodriguez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Esmerlin Salcedo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Esmerlin Salcedo), Raysa Rodriguez(individually, as surviving sibling of Esmerlin Salcedo), Amber Salcedo, Francisco Salcedo, Joel Salcedo, Kayla Salcedo, Markos Salcedo, Matilde Salcedo, Melody Salcedo, Miriam Salcedo, Orson Salcedo, Oscar Salcedo, Ethel Scott, Mary Ann Struble, Iris Vega, Maria Vega..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Islamic Republic of Iran, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Lauren Baker, Belinda Barino Dillard, Denyse Betcher, Susan Brand, Jennifer Bruno, Miriam Carter, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(individually, as surviving parent of Maria Ramirez), Elsie Cintron-Rosado(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Maria Ramirez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Maria Ramirez), Jessica Darden, Chasity DeLeon, Christopher Delosh(individually, as surviving spouse of Kathy N. Mazza), Christopher Delosh(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathy N. Mazza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kathy N. Mazza), John Doe 88, Barbara Dunleavy, Lorraine B. Foley, James J. Hargrave, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Haskell), Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Haskell), Sharon Henderson, Berdie Hicks, James Jenkins, Jr, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Joan Kirwin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Kirwin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Glenn Kirwin), Joan Kirwin(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Kirwin), Miles Kirwin, Troy Kirwin, Kathleen A. Koehler, Daniel Lamb, Joseph Lamb, Sr, Joanne Los Kamp, Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Edward Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(individually, as surviving sibling of William Micciulli ), Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Melissa Magazine, Patricia Mansfield, Ryan Marchbanks, Teresa Marchbanks(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Marchbanks, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Teresa Marchbanks(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Carolyn Marie Kelly, Karen E. Maude, Teresa Maude(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Maude, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Maude), Teresa Maude(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Maude), John Mazza, Ronald Mazza, Rose Mazza, Victor Mazza, Emily Micciulli, Sara Micciulli, Colleen Micciulli-Foley(individually, as surviving spouse of William Micciulli ), Colleen Micciulli-Foley(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Micciulli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Micciulli ), Danny J. Morino, Jeanine Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of James Murphy, IV), Jeanine Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Murphy, IV, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Murphy, IV), Maureen Murphy, Jessica A. Navas, Joseph M. Navas, Jr, Justin C. Navas, Karen A. Navas(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph M. Navas), Karen A. Navas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph M. Navas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph M. Navas), Stephen Nevins, Jackson S. OConnor, James T. OConnor, Virginia Parro, Catherine Perry, Patrick Perry, Frank Perry, Kathryn M. Quinn(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy J. Hargrave), Kathryn M. Quinn(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hargrave, deceased, the late parent of Timothy J. Hargrave), Rachel Quinnie, Maureen Regan, William Regan, Alan Retik(individually, as surviving parent of David Retik), Benjamin Retik, Dina Retik, Mark Retik, Molly Retik, Susan Retik(individually, as surviving spouse of David Retik), Susan Retik(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Retik, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Retik), Alan Retik (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynne Retik, deceased, the late parent of David Retik), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Robertson, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(individually, as surviving spouse of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Stanley Rodgers, Raysa Rodriguez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Esmerlin Salcedo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Esmerlin Salcedo), Raysa Rodriguez(individually, as surviving sibling of Esmerlin Salcedo), Amber Salcedo, Francisco Salcedo, Joel Salcedo, Kayla Salcedo, Markos Salcedo, Matilde Salcedo, Melody Salcedo, Miriam Salcedo, Orson Salcedo, Oscar Salcedo, Ethel Scott, Mary Ann Struble, Iris Vega, Maria Vega..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Jerry)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Islamic Republic Of Iran. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22513060)Document filed by John Mazza, Christopher Delosh(individually, as surviving spouse of Kathy N. Mazza), Amber Salcedo, Frank Perry, Berdie Hicks, Maureen Regan, Kathryn M. Quinn(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy J. Hargrave), Molly Retik, Teresa Marchbanks(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph R. Marchbanks, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Orson Salcedo, John Doe 88, William Regan, Miles Kirwin, Colleen Micciulli-Foley(individually, as surviving spouse of William Micciulli ), Karen A. Navas(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph M. Navas), Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Donald Robertson, Jr., deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Donald Robertson, Jr.), Susan Brand, Chasity DeLeon, Matilde Salcedo, Lorraine B. Foley, Virginia Parro, James T. OConnor, Joel Salcedo, Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Timothy Haskell), Teresa Maude(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Timothy Maude, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Timothy Maude), Rose Mazza, Belinda Barino Dillard, Francisco Salcedo, Dina Retik, Joseph Lamb, Sr, Danny J. Morino, Kayla Salcedo, Benjamin Retik, Patrick Perry, Karen E. Maude, Jeanine Murphy(individually, as surviving spouse of James Murphy, IV), Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of William Edward Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Catherine Perry, Raysa Rodriguez(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Esmerlin Salcedo, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Esmerlin Salcedo), Stephen Nevins, Andrea Madonna(individually, as surviving sibling of William Micciulli ), Sharon Henderson, Joan Kirwin(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Glenn Kirwin, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Glenn Kirwin), Susan Retik(individually, as surviving spouse of David Retik), Jessica A. Navas, Maria Vega, Karen A. Navas(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Joseph M. Navas, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Joseph M. Navas), Colleen Micciulli-Foley(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of William Micciulli, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of William Micciulli ), Jennifer Bruno, Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan, Alan Retik(individually, as surviving parent of David Retik), Jackson S. OConnor, Denyse Betcher, Barbara Dunleavy, Justin C. Navas, Miriam Carter, Jessica Darden, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(individually, as surviving parent of Maria Ramirez), Kathryn M. Quinn(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathryn Hargrave, deceased, the late parent of Timothy J. Hargrave), Troy Kirwin, Jeanmarie Hargrave, Raysa Rodriguez(individually, as surviving sibling of Esmerlin Salcedo), Teresa Maude(individually, as surviving spouse of Timothy Maude), Oscar Salcedo, Susan Retik(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of David Retik, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of David Retik), Teresa Marchbanks(individually, as surviving spouse of Joseph R Marchbanks Jr.), Kathleen A. Koehler, Stanley Rodgers, Alan Retik (as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lynne Retik, deceased, the late parent of David Retik), Joanne Los Kamp, Joan Kirwin(individually, as surviving spouse of Glenn Kirwin), Iris Vega, Elsie Cintron-Rosado(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Maria Ramirez, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Maria Ramirez), Rachel Quinnie, Ryan Marchbanks, Joseph M. Navas, Jr, Mark Retik, Melissa Magazine, Emily Micciulli, Daniel Lamb, James Jenkins, Jr, Lauren Baker, Melody Salcedo, Maureen Murphy, Karen Robertson-Jurcziak(individually, as surviving spouse of Donald Robertson, Jr.), James J. Hargrave, Victor Mazza, Markos Salcedo, Kenneth Haskell(individually, as surviving sibling of Thomas Haskell), Jeanine Murphy(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of James Murphy, IV, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of James Murphy, IV), Ethel Scott, Mary Ann Struble, Andrea Madonna(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Joan Micciulli, deceased, the late parent of William Micciulli ), Miriam Salcedo, Carolyn Marie Kelly, Ronald Mazza, Christopher Delosh(as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Kathy N. Mazza, deceased, and on behalf of all survivors and all legally entitled beneficiaries and family members of Kathy N. Mazza), Sara Micciulli, Patricia Mansfield..(Goldman, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hargrave et al v. Islamic Republic Of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Marie Kelly
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Marchbanks
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasity DeLeon
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dunleavy
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denyse Betcher
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Mazza
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Brand
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen E. Maude
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanmarie Hargrave
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Regan
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Mazza
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Murphy
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Quinnie
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markos Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Maude
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny J. Morino
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mansfield
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Nevins
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica A. Navas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Baker
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen A. Koehler
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Rodgers
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Marchbanks
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Delosh
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Carter
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lamb, Sr.
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raysa Rodriguez
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Kirwin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Scott
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Darden
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berdie Hicks
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Micciulli
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarcimeve Jimenez Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jenkins, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Henderson
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lamb
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Reilly and Regina Madigan
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph M. Navas, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. OConnor
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Kirwin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Vega
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Magazine
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Regan
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine B. Foley
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bruno
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Perry
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson S. OConnor
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Perry
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Retik
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin C. Navas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Perry
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Robertson-Jurcziak
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Struble
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matilde Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 88
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A. Navas
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Micciulli
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Los Kamp
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miles Kirwin
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Hargrave
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Murphy
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Micciulli-Foley
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orson Salcedo
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mazza
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Madonna
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Mazza
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn M. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsie Cintron-Rosado
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Vega
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Barino Dillard
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Parro
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Haskell
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T. O'Connor
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson S. O'Connor
Represented By: Bruce Elliot Strong
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Madigan
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Reilly
Represented By: Jerry Stephen Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Islamic Republic Of Iran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?