Matson v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Matson
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Veronica Wykpisz
Case Number: 1:2020cv09435
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. Document filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc...(Stecker, Stephen)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Stecker on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores, Inc...(Stecker, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Veronica Wykpisz..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 12, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Silvia Cristina Stanciu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Veronica Wykpisz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. Veronica Wykpisz, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Laura Matson..(Stanciu, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stanciu, Silvia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Veronica Wykpisz. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22522394)Document filed by Laura Matson..(Stanciu, Silvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matson v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Wykpisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Matson
Represented By: Silvia Cristina Stanciu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?