Cruz v. Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Defendant: Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv09467
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 5, 2021, at 3:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Initial Conference set for 2/5/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/24/2020) (rro)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC..(gp)
November 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
November 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
November 12, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22537417)Document filed by Shael Cruz..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shael Cruz
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Mountain Coffee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?