Davidson v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Willet Davidson
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Marget Egan, Patsy Yang, Cynthania Brann, Cynthia Brann and Margaret Egan
Case Number: 1:2020cv09500
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Mailed a copy of #11 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference to Willet Davidson, NYSID: 04883681Q, B&C No. 3491925326 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (kh)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield, to be held telephonically in accordance with instructions on the first page of this order, and as further set forth in this order.The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/6/2021) (jwh)
January 6, 2021 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #11 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jwh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: amending #7 Amended Complaint against Cynthia Brann, Margaret Egan, Patsy Yang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Willet Davidson. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint.(sc)
December 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (laq)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Willet Davidson NYSID: 04883681Q B&C No. 3491925326 Vernon C. Bain Center 1 Halleck St. Bronx, NY 10474, on 12/15/2020 Re: #9 Order. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (aan)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff must submit the SAC to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this Order, caption the document as a "Second Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 20-CV-9500 (LGS). No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, his case will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail to Plaintiff a copy of this Order and an information packet (1) outlining pro se procedures in this District and (2) containing contact information for the Pro Se Intake Unit. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/14/2020) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
December 14, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Colleen McMahon is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
December 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
December 3, 2020 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Vernon C. Bain Center at 1 Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (dsh)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/2/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #2 Complaint against Cynthania Brann, Department of Corrections, Marget Egan, Patsy Yang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Willet Davidson. Related document: #2 Complaint. (sac)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Willet Davidson.(sc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Willet Davidson.(sc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION & PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application & Prisoner Authorization to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 12/16/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 12/16/2020. Prisoner Authorization Form due by 12/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/16/2020) (Attachments: #1 IFP application, #2 Prisoner Authorization) (ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
November 16, 2020 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application & Prisoner Authorization, to Willet Davidson, NYSID: 04883681Q, B&C No. 3491925326 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck St., Bronx, NY 10474. (Attachments: # 1 IFP application, # 2 Prisoner Authorization) (dsh)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Cynthania Brann, Department of Corrections, Marget Egan, Patsy Yang. Document filed by Willet Davidson. (sac)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: The Court severs the claims of all Plaintiffs under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. Michael J. Lee will proceed as the sole plaintiff in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to open separate civil actions with new docket numbers for the following plaintiffs: Sonny Squire #4102000039; Jonathan Martinez #3492001577; Curtis Clark #1412002253; Christopher DeJesus #1412002246; Dewayne Boone #4412001752; Frank Pagan #3492001603; Jonathan Stevens #1412002119; Paul Reed #1412001725; Josiah Pringle #1412001750; Carlos Bradley #3102000187; Hopeton Prendergast #4411905343; Willie Smith #8951900921; Raymond Salgado #1412001188; Timothy Ward #2412001588; Andre Fonseca #1412002023; Walter Ware #4411803480; Shamar Calloway #4412001754; Keemal Cross #1411710237; Deryck Brown #2411800501; Hakiem Barrow # 8252000054; Devorn Parker #9002000003; Theodore Tucker #3492001370; James Jackson #1411904748; Ricardo Gilcabrera #141200522; Emmanuel Rosario #3492001164; Manuel Velasquez #3482001339; Willet Davidson #3491905326; Darius Batts #3491904664; James Clark #1411709283; Cyril Sheppard #3492002011; Michael Miata #4412000457; Andre Boyd #4411901712; Carl Henley #2411800815; Johnny Blanding #3491907402; Justin Manail #441807062; Noel Fernandez #4411904753; Luis Molina #3001900157; Lester Pearson #3002000233; Gill Graves #3002000211; Timothy Linares #5412000200; Frank Crawley #2412001232; Matthew Karelefsky #1411903366; Rampersaud Persaud #4411904165; Christopher Johnson #3492002320; Morris Tate #2412001025; Eon Struthers #5102000007; Jonathan Weaver #1412001833; Edward Branch #3002000027; and Orlando Plummer #4412001257. A copy of the Complaint (ECF No. 2) and this Order should be docketed in each new case. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to all the plaintiffs at the following address: Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, New York, 10474, and note service on the docket. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 11/9/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/19/2020) (sac).
November 9, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marget Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthania Brann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Brann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willet Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?