Valentini et al v. Group Health Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Valerio Valentini and Kathleen Valentini
Defendant: CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated, Emblem Health, Inc. and John Does 1 and 2
Case Number: 1:2020cv09526
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time; granting #40 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requests are GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file a single 40-page brief responding to Defendants' two Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall submit their opposition by January 18, 2021, and Defendants shall submit their replies by February 4, 2021. The Court wishes Mr. Cohens son the best and thanks him for his service. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/22/2020) (jca)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #28 MOTION to Withdraw #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal; withdrawing #16 Letter Motion to Seal. Accordingly, Defendants' request to withdraw their motion to seal the GHI Comprehensive Benefits Plan is GRANTED, and their motion to seal Plaintiff's confidential health records and references to those records in their Motions to Dismiss is GRANTED. This Order, of course, does not address Plaintiffs' right to disclose any personal medical records in their own motion practice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to close the motions pending at docket numbers 16 and 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/23/2020) (jca)
December 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/18/2021, Replies due by 2/4/2021. (jca)
December 22, 2020 Filing 40 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steve Cohen dated 12/22/2020., FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steve Cohen dated 12/22/2020.( Return Date set for 1/8/2021 at 11:59 PM.) Document filed by Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Cohen, Steve)
December 21, 2020 Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 21, 2020 re: Motion to Seal. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Emblem Health, Inc., Group Health Incorporated..(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 18, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Agatha M. Cole on behalf of Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Cole, Agatha)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Joshua T. Calo to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #34 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jordan K. Merson dated December 17, 2020 re: Defendant's request to seal. Document filed by Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini (on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini. ENDORSEMENT: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' letter by December 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/17/2020) (rjm)
December 17, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steve Cohen on behalf of Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Cohen, Steve)
December 17, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Jordan K. Merson dated December 17, 2020 re: Defendant's request to seal. Document filed by Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Merson, Jordan)
December 17, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Merson, Jordan)
December 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Merson, Jordan)
December 17, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. in Support re: #28 MOTION to Withdraw #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Withdraw Motion to Seal as to Exhibit A Only.. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 30 REDACTION to #21 Redacted Document, #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Memorandum of Law in Support of CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore's Motion to Dismiss (Revised as to Exhibit A) by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore.(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 29 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** BRIEF re: #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020., #18 Brief,, Memorandum of Law in Support of CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore's Motion to Dismiss (Revised as to Exhibit A). Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Emblem Health, Inc., Group Health Incorporated, Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Withdraw Motion to Seal as to Exhibit A Only. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated..(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 17, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. Related Document Number: #24 ..(Wohlforth, Eric) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 17, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Group Health Incorporated. Related Document Number: #23 ..(Wohlforth, Eric) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #26 Proposed Order #27 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
December 16, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. in Support re: #23 MOTION to Dismiss ., #24 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated..(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service).(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Group Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service).(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 REDACTION to #19 Redacted Document,, Exhibits A-F to the Certification of E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr. in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 REDACTION to #18 Brief,, Memorandum of Law in Support of CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore's Motion to Dismiss by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore.(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 REDACTION to #17 Brief,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Group Health Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss by Group Health Incorporated.(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REDACTION to #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Exhibits A-F to the Certification of E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr. in Support of the Motion to Dismiss by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated, Emblem Health, Inc., Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** BRIEF re: #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Memorandum of Law in Support of CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Emblem Health, Inc., Group Health Incorporated, Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** BRIEF re: #16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Memorandum of Law in Support of Group Health Incorporated's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Group Health Incorporated, CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Emblem Health, Inc., Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #16 .(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated December 16, 2020. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certification of E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq.).(Wohlforth, Eric)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Joshua T. Calo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23065794. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service).(Calo, Joshua)
December 16, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Joshua T. Calo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-23065794. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on February 9, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Initial Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 12/10/2020) (nb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua T. Calo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22960795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore, Group Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service).(Calo, Joshua) Modified on 12/9/2020 (bcu).
December 9, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Joshua T. Calo to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22960795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Pennsylvania;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu) Modified on 12/9/2020 (bcu).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court finds that a pre-motion conference regarding eviCore's Motion to Dismiss is unnecessary. EviCore shall file its motion by December 16, 2020. Plaintiff shall file its opposition papers by January 8, 2021. EviCore's reply, if any, is due January 15, 2021. As ordered by the Court on November 24, 2020, Defendant Group Health Incorporated ("GHI") has until December 2, 2020 to respond to the Complaint, and as further specified and set forth in this Order. Denying #6 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated 11/19/2020. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/25/2020) (rjm)
November 25, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Group Health Incorporated answer due 12/2/2020. Motions due by 12/16/2020. Responses due by 1/8/2021. Replies due by 1/15/2021. (rjm)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steve Cohen dated 11/24/2020 re: Defendants' request for pre-motion conference. Document filed by Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Cohen, Steve)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from Steve Cohen dated 11/24/2020 re: Extension of time to answer. Document filed by Kathleen Valentini, Valerio Valentini(on behalf of his minor son M.V.), Valerio Valentini..(Cohen, Steve)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that GHI's request is GRANTED, and that GHI shall have until December 8, 2020 to respond to the Complaint. The Court emphasizes that should Defendants discover that Emblem was also properly served, they must promptly notify the Court and address whether the Court has jurisdiction over this case. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have until December 2, 2020 to respond to Defendant eviCore's pre-motion letter. Granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated November 24, 2020. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. (Group Health Incorporated answer due 12/8/2020). (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 11/24/2020) (rjm)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated November 24, 2020. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore..(Wohlforth, Eric)
November 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/2/2020. (rjm)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Benjamin A. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John P. Cronan from E. Evans Wohlforth, Jr., Esq. dated 11/19/2020. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore..(Wohlforth, Eric)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Benjamin A. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22664072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Supporting Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service).(Post, Benjamin)
November 19, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Benjamin A. Post to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22664072. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charlotte Mary Howells on behalf of CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore..(Howells, Charlotte)
November 13, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 13, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 13, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MedSolutions Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent eviCore 1, LLC, Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore..(Wohlforth, Eric)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wohlforth, Eric)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 805306-20. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22556084).Document filed by CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service).(Wohlforth, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentini et al v. Group Health Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerio Valentini
Represented By: Steve Cohen
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Agatha M. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Valentini
Represented By: Steve Cohen
Represented By: Jordan Koel Merson
Represented By: Agatha M. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CareCore National LLC d/b/a eviCore
Represented By: Eric Evans Wohlforth, Jr.,
Represented By: Benjamin A Post
Represented By: Joshua Thomas Calo
Represented By: Charlotte Mary Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Health Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Evans Wohlforth, Jr.,
Represented By: Joshua Thomas Calo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emblem Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 and 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?