Erickson v. Jernigan Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John R. Erickson
Defendant: Harry J. Thie, Jernigan Capital, Inc., Howard A. Silver, James Dondero, John A. Good, Mark O. Decker and Rebecca Owen
Case Number: 1:2020cv09575
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-07160; 1:20-cv-09575 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Noam Mandel dated December 1, 2020. Document filed by John R. Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Joint Scheduling Stipulation and [Proposed] Order).(Mandel, Noam)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #21 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by John R. Erickson. Related Document Number: #18 ..(Mandel, Noam) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Noam Mandel in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint John R. Erickson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-07160; 1:20-cv-09575 .. Document filed by John R. Erickson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume).(Mandel, Noam)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Appoint John R. Erickson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-07160; 1:20-cv-09575 . . Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint John R. Erickson to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:20-cv-07160; 1:20-cv-09575 . Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rebecca Owen..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark O. Decker..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John A. Good..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jernigan Capital, Inc...(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Dondero..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Howard A. Silver..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harry J. Thie..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noam Noah Mandel. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John R. Erickson. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20-cv-07160 (ER). Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REBECCA OWEN, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MARK O. DECKER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JOHN A. GOOD, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JERNIGAN CAPITAL, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAMES DONDERO, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HOWARD A. SILVER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HARRY J. THIE, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mandel, Noam)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark O. Decker, James Dondero, John A. Good, Jernigan Capital, Inc., Rebecca Owen, Howard A. Silver, Harry J. Thie. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22575387)Document filed by John R. Erickson..(Mandel, Noam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Jernigan Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry J. Thie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jernigan Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard A. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dondero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark O. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Erickson
Represented By: Noam Noah Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?