Barro et al v. Chokdee NYC Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Braulio Hernandez, Juan Carlos Char Ortiz, Luis Eduardo Char Matz and Manuel Barro
Defendant: Chokdee NYC Inc. (d/b/a Thai Terminal) d/b/a Thai Terminal doing business as Thai Terminal, Pantipa Veerapornphimon, Ham Doe, Oat Doe, Nuttawut Veerapornphimon and Chokdee NYC Inc. doing business as Thai Terminal
Case Number: 1:2020cv09615
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel Alan Tannenbaum terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
December 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Kevin Oates, JR on behalf of Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Hernandez(individually), Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Oates, William)
December 30, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Antonio Faillace on behalf of Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Hernandez(individually), Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
December 29, 2020 Filing 19 FIRST MOTION for Daniel Alan Tannenbaum to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Hernandez(individually), Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' request for an extension of time to answer the complaint is GRANTED. By January 21, 2021, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bingchen Li on behalf of Chokdee NYC Inc., Nuttawut Veerapornphimon, Pantipa Veerapornphimon..(Li, Bingchen)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Bingchen Li dated December 22, 2020. Document filed by Chokdee NYC Inc., Nuttawut Veerapornphimon, Pantipa Veerapornphimon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Extend TIme to Respond to the Complaint).(Li, Bingchen)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Alan Tannenbaum on behalf of Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Hernandez(individually), Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. Chokdee NYC Inc. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated); Braulio Hernandez(individually); Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually); Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated); Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated); Manuel Barro(individually); Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated); Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/17/2020) (jca)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pantipa Veerapornphimon..(pc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oat Doe..(pc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nuttawut Veerapornphimon..(pc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ham Doe..(pc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chokdee NYC Inc...(pc)
November 17, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 17, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 17, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chokdee NYC Inc. (d/b/a Thai Terminal). The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ham Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oat Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nuttawut Veerapornphimon, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Pantipa Veerapornphimon, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chokdee NYC Inc. (d/b/a Thai Terminal), re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated)..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faillace, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chokdee NYC Inc. (d/b/a Thai Terminal), Ham Doe, Oat Doe, Nuttawut Veerapornphimon, Pantipa Veerapornphimon. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22600539)Document filed by Luis Eduardo Char Matz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Braulio Hernandez(individually), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(individually), Manuel Barro(on behalf of others similarly situated), Juan Carlos Char Ortiz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Manuel Barro(individually), Braulio Hernandez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Luis Eduardo Char Matz(individually)..(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barro et al v. Chokdee NYC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braulio Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Char Ortiz
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Eduardo Char Matz
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Barro
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
Represented By: William Kevin Oates, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chokdee NYC Inc. (d/b/a Thai Terminal) d/b/a Thai Terminal doing business as Thai Terminal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pantipa Veerapornphimon
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ham Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oat Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuttawut Veerapornphimon
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chokdee NYC Inc. doing business as Thai Terminal
Represented By: Bingchen Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?