Lin et al v. Benihana Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jian Ming Xue, Guo Ping Zhuo, Jun Qian, Zifu Zheng, Zhenghua Wang, Sai Hoe Loong, Xia Long Lin, Bai Ming Li, Jun Yao, Ping Cao and En Ai Lin
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-20 and Benihana Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv09672
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are hereby directed to attend a conference at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of Case Management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures, and to furnish chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must forthwith send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Tuesday, April 6, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/18/20) (yv)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benihana Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-20..(pc)
November 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
November 18, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
November 18, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
November 18, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ping Cao, Bai Ming Li, Zhenghua Wang, Jun Yao, Jian Ming Xue, Zifu Zheng, Jun Qian, En Ai Lin, Xia Long Lin, Guo Ping Zhuo, Sai Hoe Loong. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Bai Ming Li..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Guo Ping Zhuo..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jian Ming Xue..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jun Qian..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jun Yao..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ping Cao..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Sai Hoe Loong..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Xia Long Lin..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Zhenghua Wang..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Zifu Zheng..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by En Ai Lin..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Benihana Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ping Cao, Bai Ming Li, En Ai Lin, Xia Long Lin, Sai Hoe Loong, Jun Qian, Zhenghua Wang, Jian Ming Xue, Jun Yao, Zifu Zheng, Guo Ping Zhuo..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lee, C.K.)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Benihana Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-20. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22624285)Document filed by Ping Cao, Bai Ming Li, Zhenghua Wang, Jun Yao, Jian Ming Xue, Zifu Zheng, Jun Qian, En Ai Lin, Xia Long Lin, Guo Ping Zhuo, Sai Hoe Loong..(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lin et al v. Benihana Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jian Ming Xue
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guo Ping Zhuo
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Qian
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zifu Zheng
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhenghua Wang
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sai Hoe Loong
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xia Long Lin
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bai Ming Li
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jun Yao
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ping Cao
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: En Ai Lin
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benihana Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?