Roberts v. Gitelis et al
Plaintiff: Louis Roberts
Defendant: Michael Gitelis and Justin Gitelis
Case Number: 1:2020cv09694
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Debra L. Wabnik on behalf of Justin Gitelis..(Wabnik, Debra)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendant Justin Gitelis's request for a nunc pro tunc extension. He must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than February 10, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 27. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/12/21) (yv)
January 12, 2021 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Defendant Justin Gitelis dated January 12, 2021. Document filed by Justin Gitelis..(Ehrlich, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Ross Ehrlich on behalf of Justin Gitelis..(Ehrlich, David)
January 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Gitelis answer due 2/10/2021. (jca)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendant Michael Gitelis's request for a nunc pro tunc extension. He must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than February 10, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/11/2021) (jca)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew C. Laufer, PLLC dated 01/11/2021. Document filed by Michael Gitelis..(Laufer, Andrew)
January 11, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew C. Laufer on behalf of Michael Gitelis..(Laufer, Andrew)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Justin Gitelis served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. Service was accepted by Justin Gitelis. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Michael Gitelis served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021. Service was accepted by Michael Gitelis. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Gitelis..(pc)
December 15, 2020 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Justin Gitelis, re: #15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 15, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Benjamin to RE-FILE Document No. #17 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
December 15, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Gitelis..(sj)
December 14, 2020 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Gitelis, re: #15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts.(Benjamin, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/15/2020 (sj).
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Gitelis, re: #15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #7 Amended Complaint against Justin Gitelis, Michael Gitelis.Document filed by Louis Roberts. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2020. (yv)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Although the Court would be on firm ground denying the requested relief, the application is GRANTED and the Court's previous Order, ECF No. 12, is VACATED. Plaintiff is instructed to file his Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry no later than December 17, 2020, and is directed to serve Defendants with the summons and operative complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-open this case and terminate ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/14/20) (yv)
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Second addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Plaintiff's counsel dated 12/10/2020. Document filed by Louis Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint).(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 12/14/2020, Doc. # 14 ORDER... The Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Any pending motions are moot and any conferences are canceled. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/8/20) (yv) Modified on 12/14/2020 (yv).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, The Court will give Roberts one final chance to properly establish subject-matter jurisdiction. No later than December 4, 2020, Roberts shall once again amend his Complaint to properly allege the citizenship of each party to this action. If, by that date, Roberts does not file an amended complaint actually establishing this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice and without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/30/20) (yv)
November 29, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Michael Gitelis served on 11/28/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Gitelis, Deft. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Justin Gitelis served on 11/28/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Gitelis, Deft. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Gitelis..(pc)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Justin Gitelis, Michael Gitelis.Document filed by Louis Roberts. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before November 25, 2020, Plaintiff shall amend his Complaint to properly allege the citizenship of each party to this action and to include a jurisdictional statement in accordance with Rule 8. If, by that date, Plaintiff is unable to amend the Complaint to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the Complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to any party. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2020.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/19/20) (yv)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Justin Gitelis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Benjamin to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name must be listed on the 'as to' docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Benjamin to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; the PDF must be filed separately; the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Gitelis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/19/2020 (jgo).
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louis Roberts..(Benjamin, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/19/2020 (jgo).
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Gitelis, Michael Gitelis. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22638781)Document filed by Louis Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Benjamin, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Gitelis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gitelis
Represented By: Andrew C. Laufer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Gitelis
Represented By: David Ross Ehrlich
Represented By: Debra L. Wabnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Roberts
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?