Tessema v. Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Ezra Tessema
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 1:2020cv09700
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, re: to protect the data subject in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(5)(c)(A). Document filed by Ezra Tessema.(sc)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Brandon Cowart dated January 7, 2020. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
January 4, 2021 Mailed a copy of #13 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous to Ezra Tessema at JAF Post Office, General Delivery, New York, NY 10001. (kh)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #8 denying without prejudice Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED for failure to comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available online at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/honmary-kay-vyskocil. This is done without prejudice to any future motion made in accordance with the procedures outlined in the Court's Individual Rules. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint-i.e., file a pre-motion letter (see Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases Paragraph 4.A.i.)-on or before January 8, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to close docket entry number 8 and mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 12/30/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
December 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Environmental Protection Agency answer due 1/8/2021. (ama)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Documents served on Ezra Tessema on December 30, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pro Se Litigant Who Opposes a Rule 12 Motion re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous .. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Redden in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous .. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . . Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Ezra Tessema on November 19, 2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO OBJECT TO THE DEFENDANT'S PETITION TO DELAY & OBSTRUCT THE JUDICIAL DUE PROCESS. Document filed by Ezra Tessema. (sc)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's request to extend the deadline to respond to the Complaint to December 30, 2020, is HEREBY GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. Environmental Protection Agency answer due 12/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/20/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 20, 2020 Mailed a copy of #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Ezra Tessema, JAF Post Office, General Delivery, New York, NY 10001. (dsh)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Brandon Cowart dated November 19, 2020. Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency..(Cowart, Brandon)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $750,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none;. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brandon Herbert Cowart to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; party name on the PDF case caption does not exactly match as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cowart, Brandon) Modified on 11/19/2020 (jgo).
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 100947-2020..Document filed by Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons With Notice).(Cowart, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessema v. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Brandon Herbert Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezra Tessema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?