Santiago v. Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Santiago
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc. and Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc. doing business as Candlewood Suites Nanuet-Rockland County
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, INC d/b/a CANDLEWOOD SUITES NANUET ROCKLAND COUNTY
Case Number: 1:2020cv09721
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 09:204
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 2/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/8/2020) (nb) Modified on 12/9/2020 (nb). Modified on 12/28/2020 (nb).
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Lisa Santiago.(Glugeth, Jared)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jared Craig Glugeth on behalf of Lisa Santiago..(Glugeth, Jared)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Lisa Santiago; amending #1 Notice of Removal,, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc., Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint 7-14-2020, #2 Defendants' Verified Answer 8-31-2020, #3 Defendants' Discovery Demands 8-31-2020, #4 Plaintiff's Discovery Responses 10-19-20).(Goldstein, Scott)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Within ten days of the date of this Order, Defendants shall amend their Notice of Removal to fully allege the citizenship of the Defendant entities, including the state of incorporation and principal place of business. If, by the foregoing date, Defendants are unable to amend to truthfully allege complete diversity of citizenship, then the case will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without further notice to any party. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/20/2020) (rjm)
November 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (wb)
November 20, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
November 19, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
November 19, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
November 19, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott H. Goldstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000,000; Arbitration code v (Voluntary); County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, INC d/b/a CANDLEWOOD SUITES NANUET ROCKLAND COUNTY, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc..(Goldstein, Scott)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, INC d/b/a CANDLEWOOD SUITES NANUET ROCKLAND COUNTY, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc...(Goldstein, Scott)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldstein, Scott)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27319/2020E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22646102).Document filed by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, INC d/b/a CANDLEWOOD SUITES NANUET ROCKLAND COUNTY, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Summons and Complaint 7-14-2020, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Verified Answer 8-31-2020, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Discovery Demands 8-31-2020, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Responses 10-19-20).(Goldstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Scott H. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Scott H. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Scott H. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, Inc. doing business as Candlewood Suites Nanuet-Rockland County
Represented By: Scott H. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, INC d/b/a CANDLEWOOD SUITES NANUET ROCKLAND COUNTY
Represented By: Scott H. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Santiago
Represented By: Jared Craig Glugeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?